Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMCKATHAN v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01865
Date Filed2022-06-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffDENZIL E. MCKATHAN
Case DescriptionDenzil McKathan submitted a FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security, the Department of State, and the Department of Justice for records concerning himself. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, McKathan filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantEXECUTIVE OFFICE OF UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS
DefendantADMINISTRATIVE OFFICE OF UNITED STATES COURTS
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Criminal Division
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-06-271COMPLAINT against ADMINISTRATIVE OFFICE OF UNITED STATES COURTS, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 202466) filed by DENZIL E. MCKATHAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(zed) (Entered: 06/30/2022)
2022-06-29SUMMONS (7) Issued as to ADMINISTRATIVE OFFICE OF UNITED STATES COURTS, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zed) (Entered: 06/30/2022)
2022-07-012STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 1, 2022. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 07/01/2022)
2022-07-153RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/15/2022. (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 07/15/2022)
2022-08-096AFFIDAVIT of Service by DENZIL E. MCKATHAN. (zed) (Entered: 08/18/2022)
2022-08-104NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Anthony Quinn on behalf of All Defendants (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 08/10/2022)
2022-08-155MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by ADMINISTRATIVE OFFICE OF UNITED STATES COURTS, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 08/15/2022)
2022-08-15MINUTE ORDER granting the defendants' 5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint. The defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's complaint on or before September 22, 2022. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 15, 2022. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 08/15/2022)
2022-09-217MOTION for Extension of Time to file Response to Complaint by ADMINISTRATIVE OFFICE OF UNITED STATES COURTS, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 09/21/2022)
2022-09-21MINUTE ORDER granting the defendants' 7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint. The defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's complaint on or before October 21, 2022. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 21, 2022. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 09/21/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar