Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER TO ADVANCE SECURITY IN AMERICA v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01934
Date Filed2022-07-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffCENTER TO ADVANCE SECURITY IN AMERICA
Case DescriptionThe Center to Advance Security in America submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning policies to combat misinformation as well as the January 6 assault on the Capitol. CISA also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, CISA filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
Complaint attachment 21
Complaint attachment 22
Complaint attachment 23
Complaint attachment 24
Complaint attachment 25
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-07-051COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9347565) filed by CENTER TO ADVANCE SECURITY IN AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons DHS Summons, # 3 Summons US Atty Summons, # 4 Summons US AG Summons, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit List, # 6 Exhibit Ex. 1, # 7 Exhibit Ex. 2, # 8 Exhibit Ex. 3, # 9 Exhibit Ex. 4, # 10 Exhibit Ex. 5, # 11 Exhibit Ex. 6, # 12 Exhibit Ex. 7, # 13 Exhibit Ex. 8, # 14 Exhibit Ex. 9, # 15 Exhibit Ex. 10, # 16 Exhibit Ex. 11, # 17 Exhibit Ex. 12, # 18 Exhibit Ex. 13, # 19 Exhibit Ex. 14, # 20 Exhibit Ex. 15, # 21 Exhibit Ex. 16, # 22 Exhibit Ex. 17, # 23 Exhibit Ex. 18, # 24 Exhibit Ex. 19, # 25 Exhibit Ex. 20)(Bartkowski, Paul) (Entered: 07/05/2022)
2022-07-06Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (znmg) (Entered: 07/06/2022)
2022-07-062SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 07/06/2022)
2022-07-083STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on July 8, 2022. (lccjn2) (Entered: 07/08/2022)
2022-07-284NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen DeGenaro on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 07/28/2022)
2022-07-285Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 07/28/2022)
2022-07-29MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of 5 the Consent Motion for an Extension of Time, it is ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before September 7, 2022. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on July 29. 2022. (lccjn2) (Entered: 07/29/2022)
2022-07-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 9/7/2022. (zcal) (Entered: 08/01/2022)
2022-09-076ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 09/07/2022)
2022-09-077Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge for All Purposes by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.. (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 09/07/2022)
2022-09-078STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 09/07/2022)
2022-09-19MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the 7 Joint Notice of Consent to Assignment to Magistrate Judge, it is ORDERED that this action be randomly referred to a United States Magistrate Judge for all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(a), 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on September 19, 2022. (lccjn2) (Entered: 09/19/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar