Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST v. NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01937
Date Filed2022-07-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffPROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST
Case DescriptionProtect the Public's Trust submitted a FOIA request to the National Institute of Health for records concerning a study on Visceral Leishmaniasis. PPT also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency PPT filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-07-051COMPLAINT against NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9349003) filed by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - FOIA 57488, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney's Office, # 4 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney General, # 5 Summons Summons -- HHS GC)(Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 07/05/2022)
2022-07-072Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zmh) (Entered: 07/07/2022)
2022-07-073SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmh) (Entered: 07/07/2022)
2022-08-024NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 08/02/2022)
2022-08-025ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH.(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 08/02/2022)
2022-08-03MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by 8/17/2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/3/2022. (lccrc2) (Entered: 08/03/2022)
2022-08-176Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 08/17/2022)
2022-08-18MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 6 Joint Status Report, the parties are ORDERED to file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by 9/16/2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/18/2022. (lccrc2) (Entered: 08/18/2022)
2022-09-167Joint STATUS REPORT by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST. (Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 09/16/2022)
2022-09-20MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties 7 Joint Status Report, the parties are ORDERED to file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by October 17, 2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 9/19/2022. (lccrc2) (Entered: 09/20/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar