Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCATO INSTITUTE v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01940
Date Filed2022-07-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffCATO INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionThe Cato Institute submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning implementation of Presidential Proclamation 9645. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency told the Cato Institute that it found no responsive records. The Cato Institute asked the agency how it conducted its search. The agency then told the Cato Institute that it could file an administrative appeal. The Cato Institute filed an administrative appeal. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Cato Institute filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-07-051COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9349438) filed by CATO INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex 1-8, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/05/2022)
2022-07-052NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of CATO INSTITUTE (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/05/2022)
2022-07-053NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Loevy on behalf of CATO INSTITUTE (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 07/05/2022)
2022-07-06Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zsb) (Entered: 07/06/2022)
2022-07-074SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 07/07/2022)
2022-09-025NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 09/02/2022)
2022-09-026ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 09/02/2022)
2022-09-06MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by October 3, 2022. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/6/2022. (lctjk1) (Entered: 09/06/2022)
2022-10-037Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 10/03/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar