Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN v. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01949
Date Filed2022-07-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffAMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN
Case DescriptionThe American Wild Horse Campaign submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning foals born to wild horses or wild burros in BLM's Off-Range Corral holding facilities. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, AWHC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-07-061COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9352768) filed by AMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 07/06/2022)
2022-07-11Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zsb) (Entered: 07/11/2022)
2022-07-112SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 07/11/2022)
2022-07-293NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 07/29/2022)
2022-08-154ANSWER to Complaint by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT.(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 08/15/2022)
2022-08-15MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall confer and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by August 29, 2022. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 08/15/2022. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 08/15/2022)
2022-08-295Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 08/29/2022)
2022-08-30MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 5 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by October 6, 2022. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/30/2022. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 08/30/2022)
2022-08-30Set/Reset Deadlines: JSR due by 10/6/2022. (nbn) Modified deadline type on 8/30/2022 (nbn). (Entered: 08/30/2022)
2022-08-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/6/2022. (znbn) (Entered: 08/30/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar