Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN v. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01952
Date Filed2022-07-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffAMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN
Case DescriptionThe American Wild Horse Campaign submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning foals born to wild horse or wild burrows in BLM's Off-Range Corral holding facilities. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, AWHC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-07-071COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9352907) filed by AMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Stotter, Daniel) Modified on 7/11/2022 to add payment information (zsb). (Entered: 07/07/2022)
2022-07-11Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zsb) (Entered: 07/11/2022)
2022-07-132SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmh) (Entered: 07/13/2022)
2022-08-013NOTICE of Appearance by Dedra Seibel Curteman on behalf of All Defendants (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 08/01/2022)
2022-08-014Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 08/01/2022)
2022-08-01MINUTE ORDER GRANTING 4 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall file its answer by September 16, 2022. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/1/2022. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 08/01/2022)
2022-08-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 9/16/2022 (lsj) (Entered: 08/01/2022)
2022-09-165ANSWER to Complaint by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT.(Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 09/16/2022)
2022-09-16MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall confer and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by September 30, 2022. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 09/16/2022. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 09/16/2022)
2022-09-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 9/30/2022. (znbn) (Entered: 09/16/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar