Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleZenith Law Group v. Drug Enforcement Administration
DistrictEastern District of Arkansas
CityCentral Division
Case Number4:2022cv00623
Date Filed2022-07-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Brian S. Miller
PlaintiffZenith Law Group
Case DescriptionThe Zenith Law Group submitted a FOIA request to the Drug Enforcement Administration for records concerning practices and procedures pertaining to civil asset forfeitures. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Zenith Law Group filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDrug Enforcement Administration United States
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-07-071COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Drug Enforcement Administration, filed by Zenith Law Group. Filing Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT087419. Summons issued. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr) (Entered: 07/07/2022)
2022-07-082Deficiency Letter from the Clerk of Court re 1 Complaint for Injunctive Relief, notifying party that a Corporate Disclosure Statement was not filed with first appearance, pleading, petition, motion response, or other request (F.R.Cv.P. 7.1). (kdr) (Entered: 07/08/2022)
2022-08-013ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Drug Enforcement Administration.(Dempsey, Jamie) (Entered: 08/01/2022)
2022-08-174REQUEST for Admissions by Zenith Law Group.(Clifford, Eugene) (Entered: 08/17/2022)
2022-08-175Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Zenith Law Group (Clifford, Eugene) (Entered: 08/17/2022)
2022-08-196INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 10/27/2022; Rule 26(f) Report due by 11/9/2022; Bench Trial proposed for sometime during the week of 2/26/2024 at 9:30 a.m. in Little Rock Courtroom #2D before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 8/19/2022. (ljb) (Entered: 08/19/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar