Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHERITAGE FOUNDATION et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01969
Date Filed2022-07-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffHERITAGE FOUNDATION
PlaintiffMIKE HOWELL
Case DescriptionThe Heritage Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning the agency and Babel Street Products. The Heritage Foundation also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency indicated that its search yielded a potential 2.1 gigs of data and asked the Heritage Foundation to narrow its request. After hearing nothing further fro0m the agency, the Heritage Foundation filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-07-071COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9354959) filed by MIKE HOWELL, HERITAGE FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit)(Dewey, Samuel) (Entered: 07/07/2022)
2022-07-11Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zsb) (Entered: 07/11/2022)
2022-07-122SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmh) (Entered: 07/12/2022)
2022-07-213ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/18/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/17/2022. (Dewey, Samuel) Modified on 7/22/2022 (zjm). (Entered: 07/21/2022)
2022-07-214RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General July, 18, 2022. (Dewey, Samuel) (Entered: 07/21/2022)
2022-07-215RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 7/15/2022 (Dewey, Samuel) (Entered: 07/21/2022)
2022-07-22NOTICE OF ERROR regarding 3 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney,. The following error(s) need correction: Please Refile Return of Service using Affidavit or proof of delivery using the delivery date as date of service. (zjm) (Entered: 07/22/2022)
2022-07-226RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/18/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/17/2022. (Dewey, Samuel) (Entered: 07/22/2022)
2022-08-177NOTICE of Appearance by Brenda A. Gonzalez Horowitz on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Gonzalez Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 08/17/2022)
2022-08-178ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Gonzalez Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 08/17/2022)
2022-08-19MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by September 29, 2022. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 08/19/2022. (lctjk2) (Entered: 08/19/2022)
2022-09-299Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Gonzalez Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 09/29/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar