Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSCHMITZ v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01973
Date Filed2022-07-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Jia M. Cobb
PlaintiffJOSEPH E. SCHMITZ HON.
Case DescriptionJoseph Schmitz, who served as the DOD's Inspector General from 2002 to 2005, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Defense Office of Inspector General for records concerning a purchase and sales agreement. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The redacted information under Exemption 4 (commercial and confidential) and Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy). Schmitz filed an administrative appeal. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Schmitz filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE INSPECTOR GENERAL
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-07-071COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE INSPECTOR GENERAL ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BDCDC-9356066) filed by JOSEPH E SCHMITZ. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(O'Beirne, Philip) (Entered: 07/07/2022)
2022-07-11Case Assigned to Judge Jia M. Cobb. (zsb) (Entered: 07/11/2022)
2022-07-13NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to pobeirne@steinmitchell.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing/incorrect summonses. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to issue. (zmh, ) (Entered: 07/13/2022)
2022-07-142REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by JOSEPH E. SCHMITZ.(O'Beirne, Philip) (Entered: 07/14/2022)
2022-07-153SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 07/15/2022)
2022-08-024RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/26/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/25/2022. (O'Beirne, Philip) (Entered: 08/02/2022)
2022-08-185ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL.(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/18/2022)
2022-08-19MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the Parties confer and submit a joint proposed schedule for further proceedings, which shall include a proposed schedule for the processing and release of responsive records or for briefing dispositive motions, by September 2, 2022. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on August 19, 2022. (lcjmc2) (Entered: 08/19/2022)
2022-09-026Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/02/2022)
2022-09-06MINUTE ORDER re 6 Joint Status Report: Upon consideration of the Parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern further proceedings: Defendant's motion for summary judgment is due October 17, 2022; Plaintiff's opposition is due November 21, 2022; and Defendant's reply is due December 15, 2022. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on September 6, 2022. (lcjmc1) (Entered: 09/06/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar