Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-07-07 | 1 | Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Receipt No. 8577846. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Greater Hells Canyon Council against All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet). (ecp) (Entered: 07/07/2022) |
2022-07-07 | 2 | Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael W. Mosman. (ecp) (Entered: 07/07/2022) |
2022-07-07 | 3 | Proposed Summons (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Summons) Filed by Greater Hells Canyon Council. (Hogan-Freemole, Erin) (Entered: 07/07/2022) |
2022-07-07 | 4 | Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Department of Agriculture, United States Forest Service. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp) (Entered: 07/07/2022) |
2022-07-07 | 5 | Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Greater Hells Canyon Council. (Hogan-Freemole, Erin) (Entered: 07/07/2022) |
2022-07-27 | 6 | Affidavit of Service upon All Defendants Filed by Greater Hells Canyon Council. (Hogan-Freemole, Erin) (Entered: 07/27/2022) |
2022-07-27 | 7 | Return of Service Executed as to United States Forest Service served on 7/11/2022, answer due on 8/10/2022. Service specifically made upon Local U.S. Attorney. (Hogan-Freemole, Erin) (Entered: 07/27/2022) |
2022-08-10 | 8 | Answer to 1 Complaint . Filed by United States Department of Agriculture, United States Forest Service. (Rice-Stitt, Austin) (Entered: 08/10/2022) |
2022-08-15 | 9 | Return of Service Executed as to United States Department of Agriculture served on 7/11/2022, answer due on 8/10/2022. Service specifically made upon Local U.S. Attorney. (Hogan-Freemole, Erin) (Entered: 08/15/2022) |
2022-09-07 | 10 | Joint Status Report and Stipulated Motion to Stay by All Defendants. Filed by All Defendants. (Rice-Stitt, Austin) (Entered: 09/07/2022) |
2022-09-09 | 11 | ORDER: Parties' Stipulated Motion to Stay Proceedings 10 is GRANTED. The Court GRANTS a stay of this case until February 10, 2023. The Court ORDERS the Parties to file a Joint Status Report by February 10, 2023. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (joha) (Entered: 09/09/2022) |
2023-02-10 | 12 | Second Joint Status Report . Filed by Greater Hells Canyon Council. (Hogan-Freemole, Erin) (Entered: 02/10/2023) |
2023-02-13 | 13 | ORDER: The Court has reviewed the Parties' Joint Status Report 12 and GRANTS the Parties' request therein. All deadlines in this matter are stayed until April 10, 2023. A joint status report is due by April 10, 2023. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms) (Entered: 02/13/2023) |
2023-04-07 | 14 | Joint Status Report by All Defendants. Filed by All Defendants. (Rice-Stitt, Austin) (Entered: 04/07/2023) |
2023-04-11 | 15 | ORDER: The Court has reviewed the Parties' Joint Status Report 14 and GRANTS the Parties' request therein. All deadlines in this matter are stayed until June 30, 2023. A joint status report is due on or before June 30, 2023. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms) (Entered: 04/11/2023) |
2023-04-26 | 16 | Notice of Attorney Substitution: Meriel L. Darzen and Oliver J.H. Stiefel are substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Erin Hogan-Freemole . Filed by on behalf of Greater Hells Canyon Council. (Hogan-Freemole, Erin) Modified on 4/27/2023, to correct docket text (cw). (Entered: 04/26/2023) |
2023-06-30 | 17 | Joint Status Report . Filed by All Defendants. (Rice-Stitt, Austin) (Entered: 06/30/2023) |
2023-07-10 | 18 | Scheduling Order. Telephone Status Conference is set for 7/12/2023 at 11:30AM in Portland before Judge Michael W. Mosman. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms) (Entered: 07/10/2023) |
2023-07-12 | 19 | MINUTES of Proceedings: Telephone Status Conference held before Judge Michael W. Mosman on July 12, 2023. As discussed on the record, Defendants are to continue making productions. A subsequent Telephone Status Conference is set for January 3, 2024, at 9:30AM. David Bahr present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Austin Rice-Stitt present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Bonita Shumway. Judge Michael W. Mosman presiding. (kms) (Entered: 07/12/2023) |
2024-01-03 | 20 | MINUTES of Proceedings: Telephone Status Conference held before Judge Michael W. Mosman on January 3, 2024. As discussed on the record, Defendants must complete productions by April 10, 2024. A telephone status conference is set for April 10, 2024, at 10:30 am. David Bahr present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Austin Rice-Stitt present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Bonita Shumway. Judge Michael W. Mosman presiding. (kms) (Entered: 01/03/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |