Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-07-07 | 1 | Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Plaintiff Kif Augustine-Adams is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day. NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mh) (Entered: 07/07/2022) |
2022-07-07 | 2 | COMPLAINT against United States Department of Health and Human Services (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4384437) filed by Kif Augustine-Adams. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (Goodwin, Scott) (Entered: 07/07/2022) |
2022-07-07 | 3 | ERRATA to 2 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Kif Augustine-Adams Civil Cover Sheet . (Goodwin, Scott) (Entered: 07/07/2022) |
2022-07-07 | 4 | **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** Summons Issued Electronically as to the U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh) (Entered: 07/07/2022) |
2022-07-07 | 5 | **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Department of Health and Human Services. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh) (Entered: 07/07/2022) |
2022-07-07 | 6 | **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** Summons Issued Electronically as to the U.S. ATTORNEY FOR THE DISTRICT OF UTAH. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh) (Entered: 07/07/2022) |
2022-07-11 | 7 | ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff(s) must propose a discovery schedule to defendant(s) in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within twenty-one (21) days after any defendant has been served or any defendant has appeared, unless any party is appearing pro se. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 07/11/2022. (jl) (Entered: 07/11/2022) |
2022-07-18 | 8 | **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kif Augustine-Adams. United States Department of Health and Human Services served on 7/12/2022, answer due 9/12/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service for U.S. Attorney for the District of Utah, # 2 Proof of Service for U.S. Attorney General)(Goodwin, Scott) (Entered: 07/18/2022) |
2022-08-02 | 9 | MOTION for Extension of Time to Propose Schedule and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Kif Augustine-Adams. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodwin, Scott) (Entered: 08/02/2022) |
2022-08-03 | 10 | ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Propose Schedule. See order for deadline modifications. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 8/3/22. (alf) (Entered: 08/03/2022) |
2022-08-05 | 11 | NOTICE of Appearance by Melina Shiraldi on behalf of United States Department of Health and Human Services (Shiraldi, Melina) (Entered: 08/05/2022) |
2022-08-08 | 12 | Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 2 Complaint, filed by Defendant United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Shiraldi, Melina) (Entered: 08/08/2022) |
2022-08-09 | 13 | NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Kif Augustine-Adams, Defendant United States Department of Health and Human Services. (alf) (Entered: 08/09/2022) |
2022-08-09 | 14 | NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form on this link To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form and place Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Please do not file the Consent Form in the case. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Kif Augustine-Adams, Defendant United States Department of Health and Human Services. Form due by 8/30/2022. (alf) (Entered: 08/09/2022) |
2022-08-10 | 15 | DOCKET TEXT ORDER. GRANTING Defendant United States Department of Health And Human Services' stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to file a Response to Plaintiff's Complaint 12 . Based on the parties' stipulation, Defendant's Response is due no later than October 10, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 08/10/2022. (Entered: 08/10/2022) |
2022-08-29 | 16 | RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant United States Department of Health and Human Services. (alf) (Entered: 08/29/2022) |
2022-08-29 | 17 | RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Kif Augustine-Adams. (alf) (Entered: 08/29/2022) |
2022-08-29 | 18 | CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Plaintiff Kif Augustine-Adams, Defendant United States Department of Health and Human Services. (alf) (Entered: 08/29/2022) |
2022-10-11 | 19 | Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 2 Complaint, filed by Defendant United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Shiraldi, Melina) (Entered: 10/11/2022) |
2022-10-12 | 20 | DOCKET TEXT ORDER. Defendant United States Department of Health and Human Services' Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED 19 . Defendant's deadline to file a response to the complaint is hereby extended to October 25, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 10/12/2022. (Entered: 10/12/2022) |
2022-10-24 | 21 | Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 2 Complaint, filed by Defendant United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Shiraldi, Melina) (Entered: 10/24/2022) |
2022-10-25 | 22 | DOCKET TEXT ORDER. Defendant United States Department of Health and Human Services' Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED 21 . Defendant's deadline to file a response to the complaint is hereby extended to November 8, 2022. No attached document Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 10/25/2022. (Entered: 10/25/2022) |
2022-11-08 | 23 | Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 2 Complaint, filed by Defendant United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Shiraldi, Melina) (Entered: 11/08/2022) |
2022-11-09 | 24 | DOCKET TEXT ORDER. Granting the parties' stipulated Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint 23 . Defendant's deadline to file a response to the complaint is hereby extended to November 22, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 11/09/2022. No attached document. (Entered: 11/09/2022) |
2022-11-09 | 25 | DOCKET TEXT ORDER. Granting Motion for Extension of Time 21 per October 25, 2022 Order. See, ECF No. 22 Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 11/09/2022. No attached document. (Entered: 11/09/2022) |
2022-11-22 | 26 | Stipulated MOTION to Stay filed by Defendant United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Shiraldi, Melina) (Entered: 11/22/2022) |
2022-11-30 | 27 | ORDER granting 26 Stipulated Motion to Stay re: responsive processing schedule. The parties shall have until December 12, 2022, to file a joint status report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 11/30/2022. (alf) (Entered: 12/01/2022) |
2022-12-13 | 28 | STATUS REPORT by United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Shiraldi, Melina) (Entered: 12/13/2022) |
2022-12-14 | 29 | DOCKET TEXT ORDER. Pursuant to the parties' Joint Status Report 28 , the case remains stayed with productions continuing every thirty days. The parties will continue to provide quarterly joint status updates to the court, with the next report due March 12, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 12/14/2022. (Entered: 12/14/2022) |
2023-04-03 | 30 | DOCKET TEXT ORDER. No later than April 10, 2023, the parties shall provide the required joint status update and address their failure to do so by March 12, 2023. See, Docket Text Order (ECF No. 29) ("The parties will continue to provide quarterly joint status updates to the court, with the next report due March 12, 2023."). No attached document Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 04/03/2023. (amn) (Entered: 04/03/2023) |
2023-04-04 | 31 | STATUS REPORT by United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Shiraldi, Melina) (Entered: 04/04/2023) |
2023-06-05 | 32 | DOCKET TEXT ORDER. Pursuant to the parties' Joint Status Report 31 , the case remains stayed with productions continuing every thirty days. The parties will continue to provide quarterly joint status updates to the court, with the next report due July 5, 2023. No attached document Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 06/05/2023. (amn) (Entered: 06/05/2023) |
2023-07-07 | 33 | STATUS REPORT by United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Shiraldi, Melina) (Entered: 07/07/2023) |
2023-07-08 | 34 | DOCKET TEXT ORDER. Pursuant to the parties' Joint Status Report 33 , the case remains stayed with productions continuing every thirty days. The parties will continue to provide quarterly joint status updates to the court, with the next report due October 3, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 07/08/2023. (amn) (Entered: 07/08/2023) |
2023-10-03 | 35 | STATUS REPORT by United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Shiraldi, Melina) (Entered: 10/03/2023) |
2023-10-04 | 36 | DOCKET TEXT ORDER. Pursuant to the parties' Joint Status Report 33 , the case remains stayed with productions continuing every thirty days. The parties will continue to provide the court with quarterly joint status updates with the next report due January 2, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 10/04/2023. (amn) (Entered: 10/04/2023) |
2024-01-04 | 37 | STATUS REPORT by United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Shiraldi, Melina) (Entered: 01/04/2024) |
2024-01-05 | 38 | NOTICE OF STATUS HEARING : In lieu of the parties filing their upcoming Status Report, the Court will hold a Status Hearing and Scheduling Conference on April 1, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. Instructions on appearing before Zoom will be emailed to the parties. (amn) (Entered: 01/05/2024) |
2024-03-04 | 39 | SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL John J. Nielsen replacing Scott D. Goodwin as counsel on behalf of Kif Augustine-Adams. (Nielsen, John) (Entered: 03/04/2024) |
2024-03-07 | 40 | MOTION for Change of Judge filed by Defendant United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shiraldi, Melina) (Entered: 03/07/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |