Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCaetano v. Internal Revenue Service et al
DistrictEastern District of California
CityFresno
Case Number1:2022cv00837
Date Filed2022-07-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Jennifer L. Thurston
PlaintiffNathaniel Dwayne Caetano
Case DescriptionNathaniel Caetano, a prisoner, sought access to records from the Internal Revenue Service, a number of other federal agencies, and state agencies. This is not a FOIA case.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantInternal Revenue Service
DefendantGeneral Service Administration
DefendantSecurities and Exchange Commission
DefendantUnited States Department of Justice
DefendantUnited States Department of the Treasury
DefendantCalifornia Department of Financial Protection and Innovation
DefendantCalifornia Secretary of State
DefendantCounty of Kings
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [3]
Opinion/Order [6]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-07-081COMPLAINT against California Department of Financial Protection and Innovation, California Secretary of State, County of Kings, General Service Administration, Internal Revenue Service, Securities and Exchange Commission, United States Department of Justice, United States Department of the Treasury by Nathaniel Dwayne Caetano. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Lawrence, A) (Entered: 07/11/2022)
2022-07-082MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Nathaniel Dwayne Caetano. (Lawrence, A) (Entered: 07/11/2022)
2022-07-11APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Lawrence, A) (Entered: 07/11/2022)
2022-07-123ORDER GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP and Directing Payment of Inmate Filing Fee by California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation and Directing Clerk of Court to Issue Prisoner New Case Documents signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/12/2022. (Attachments: # 1 IFP Motion). (Lawrence, A) (Entered: 07/12/2022)
2022-07-124PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED: Plaintiff's Consent or Decline due within thirty (30) days . (Attachments: # 1 Order re Consent) (Lawrence, A) (Entered: 07/12/2022)
2022-07-12SERVICE BY MAIL: 4 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, 3 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Nathaniel Dwayne Caetano. (Lawrence, A) (Entered: 07/12/2022)
2022-08-045CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 08/05/2022)
2022-08-116ORDER SCREENING COMPLAINT, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/11/2022. ( First Amended Complaint due by 9/26/2022) (Attachments: # 1 Amended Complaint Form)(Martin-Gill, S) (Entered: 08/11/2022)
2022-08-11SERVICE BY MAIL: 6 Order, served on Nathaniel Dwayne Caetano. (Martin-Gill, S) (Entered: 08/11/2022)
2022-09-137FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT by Nathaniel Dwayne Caetano.(Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 09/13/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar