Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRUDOMETKIN v. WORMUTH
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01968
Date Filed2022-07-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Jia M. Cobb
PlaintiffDAVID J. RUDOMETKIN
Case DescriptionDavid Rudometkin submitted FOIA requests to the Department of the Army for records concerning himself. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Rudometkin filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCHRISTINE WORMUTH in her capacity as Secretary of the U.S. Army
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-07-051COMPLAINT against CHRISTINE WORMUTH ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 202548) filed by DAVID J. RUDOMETKIN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(zjm) (Entered: 07/11/2022)
2022-07-05SUMMONS Not Issued as to CHRISTINE WORMUTH (zjm) (Entered: 07/11/2022)
2022-09-26MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff filed this action pro se on July 5, 2022. Plaintiff is not proceeding in forma pauperis and is therefore responsible for serving Defendant with process, consisting of the summons and a copy of the complaint. Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c). "If a defendant is not served within 90 days after the complaint is filed, the court--on motion or on its own after notice to the plaintiff--must dismiss the action without prejudice... or order that service be made within a specified time," unless "plaintiff shows good cause for the failure." Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Plaintiff is reminded that, in this case, the 90-day deadline for service will expire after October 3, 2022. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on 9/26/2022. (lcjmc3) (Entered: 09/26/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar