Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-07-11 | 1 | COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33605565 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Amy Terra. (Attorney Ethan Preston added to party Amy Terra(pty:pla))(Preston, Ethan) (Entered: 07/11/2022) |
2022-07-11 | 2 | CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Amy Terra. (Preston, Ethan) (Entered: 07/11/2022) |
2022-07-11 | 3 | CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Amy Terra, identifying N/A. (Preston, Ethan) (Entered: 07/11/2022) |
2022-07-11 | 4 | Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff Amy Terra. (Preston, Ethan) (Entered: 07/11/2022) |
2022-07-11 | 5 | NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (et) (Entered: 07/11/2022) |
2022-07-11 | 6 | NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 07/11/2022) |
2022-07-11 | 7 | Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 07/11/2022) |
2022-07-11 | 8 | NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties 3 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Notice of interested parties is blank. An Amended Notice of Interested Parties is required to be e-filed. (et) (Entered: 07/11/2022) |
2022-07-11 | 9 | AMENDED CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Amy Terra, identifying n/a. (Preston, Ethan) (Entered: 07/11/2022) |
2022-07-11 | 10 | NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request 4 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect document is attached to Request for Clerk to Issued Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (et) (Entered: 07/11/2022) |
2022-07-11 | 11 | Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff Amy Terra. (Preston, Ethan) (Entered: 07/11/2022) |
2022-07-11 | 12 | STANDING ORDER by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This case has been assigned to United States District Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (iv) (Entered: 07/11/2022) |
2022-07-11 | 13 | 30 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendant United States Department of Education. (et) (Entered: 07/11/2022) |
2022-08-03 | 14 | STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to United States Department of Education answer now due 9/17/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Defendant United States Department of Education.(Attorney Ryan Casey Chapman added to party United States Department of Education(pty:dft))(Chapman, Ryan) (Entered: 08/03/2022) |
2022-08-15 | 15 | DECLARATION OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Amy Terra, re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form 6 , Summons Request 11 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only 12 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form 5 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) 2 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form 7 served on July 19, 2022. (Preston, Ethan) (Entered: 08/15/2022) |
2022-09-12 | 16 | STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to November 16, 2022 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Defendant United States Department of Education. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Chapman, Ryan) (Entered: 09/12/2022) |
2022-09-13 | 17 | ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE DATE 16 by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. The deadline for Defendant's response to the Complaint is extended to November 16, 2022. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom) (Entered: 09/13/2022) |
2022-11-16 | 18 | ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Defendant United States Department of Education.(Chapman, Ryan) (Entered: 11/16/2022) |
2022-11-16 | 19 | ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/28/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 1/11/2023 at 03:00 PM before Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (pg) (Entered: 11/16/2022) |
2022-12-05 | 20 | REQUEST for Leave of Ethan Preston to Appear for via Zoom filed by Plaintiff Amy Terra. Request set for hearing on 1/11/2023 at 03:00 PM before Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ethan Preston, # 2 Proposed Order) (Preston, Ethan) (Entered: 12/05/2022) |
2022-12-05 | 21 | NOTICE TO FILER RE DEFICIENCY by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. Pursuant to the filing of the Request for Leave of Ethan Preston to Appear via Zoom, Dkt. No. 20 . A WordPerfect or Microsoft Word copy of the proposed document along with a PDF copy of the electronically filed main document was to be emailed to Judge Garnetts generic chambers email address in compliance with L.R. 5-4.4.2. Counsel shall email the necessary documents by December 6, 2022. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 12/05/2022) |
2022-12-08 | 22 | ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF AMY TERRA'S UNOPPOSED REQUEST FOR COUNSEL TO APPEAR REMOTELY AT JANUARY 11, 2023 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [ECF NO. 20] by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. This Court GRANTS leave for Terra's counsel to appear via Zoom at the Scheduling Conference now set for January 11, 2023 at 3:00 p.m. (lom) (Entered: 12/08/2022) |
2022-12-27 | 23 | JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Defendant United States Department of Education.. (Chapman, Ryan) (Entered: 12/27/2022) |
2023-01-06 | 24 | MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) SCHEDULING ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL DEADLINES by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm) Modified on 1/6/2023 (rolm). (Entered: 01/06/2023) |
2023-01-06 | 25 | (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett: The Court has reviewed the Joint Rule 26(f) Report submitted by the parties and determines that an in-person Scheduling Conference is unnecessary. Accordingly, the Court VACATES the January 11, 2023, Scheduling Conference. Refer to Scheduling Order filed at dkt. no. 24. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/06/2023) |
2023-04-18 | 26 | Notice OF ANTICIPATED SETTLEMENT AND JOINT REQUEST TO VACATE BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by Defendant United States Department of Education. (Chapman, Ryan) (Entered: 04/18/2023) |
2023-04-18 | 27 | SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett: On April 17, 2023, Plaintiff filed Notice of Settlement (Dkt. No. 26). The Court sets an Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for July 26, 2023, at 1:30 p.m. If the parties file a dismissal by July 21, 2023, the matter will be taken off calendar and no appearance by counsel will be required. All pending dates are vacated. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 04/18/2023) |
2023-07-17 | 28 | STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by Defendant United States Department of Education.(Chapman, Ryan) (Entered: 07/17/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |