Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCHINESE AMERICAN LEGAL DEFENSE ALLIANCE v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv02001
Date Filed2022-07-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffCHINESE AMERICAN LEGAL DEFENSE ALLIANCE
Case DescriptionThe Chinese American Legal Defense Alliance submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning the implementation of the China Initiative involving prosecution of anti-Asian crimes. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told CALDA that its request qualified for the complex track for processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency CALDA filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-07-111COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9361510) filed by CHINESE AMERICAN LEGAL DEFENSE ALLIANCE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1- Request, # 2 Exhibit 2- Response, # 3 Exhibit 3- May 3, 2022 ECD, # 4 Exhibit 4- DOJ ECD Response, # 5 Exhibit 5- June 21, 2022 ECD, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons to DOJ, # 8 Summons to FBI, # 9 Summons to USAG, # 10 Summons to USAO)(Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 07/11/2022)
2022-07-12Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsb) (Entered: 07/12/2022)
2022-07-142SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsss) (Entered: 07/14/2022)
2022-07-313NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie R. Johnson on behalf of FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 07/31/2022)
2022-08-124Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 08/12/2022)
2022-08-15MINUTE ORDER: Granting Consent 4 Motion for Extension of Deadlines. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by September 16, 2022. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/15/22. (DJS) (Entered: 08/15/2022)
2022-08-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 9/16/2022. (tb) (Entered: 08/19/2022)
2022-09-155Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/15/2022)
2022-09-21MINUTE ORDER: Defendants' 5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED. Defendants' Answer is now due 9/30/2022. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 09/21/2022. (lcwk) (Entered: 09/21/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar