Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleZyzda-Martin, Leslie v. Office of Information and Privacy
DistrictWestern District of Wisconsin
CityMadison
Case Number3:2022cv00380
Date Filed2022-07-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge William M. Conley
PlaintiffCol. Leslie Zyzda-Martin
Case DescriptionCol. Leslie Zyzda-Martin submitted a FOIA request to the U.S. National Guard Bureau for records concerning her employment by the National Guard. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Zyzda-Martin filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantOffice of Information and Privacy an agency of the U.S. National Guard Bureau
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-07-111COMPLAINT against Office of Information and Privacy. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AWIWDC-3089689.), filed by Leslie Zyzda-Martin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Feb 28, 2022 Request, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - March 2, 2022 follow up request, # 3 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons) (Behm, Lili) (Entered: 07/11/2022)
2022-07-11Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak) (Entered: 07/11/2022)
2022-07-11Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: NORTC , Corporate Disclosure Statement . (lak) (Entered: 07/11/2022)
2022-07-112Summons Issued as to Office of Information and Privacy. (lak) (Entered: 07/11/2022)
2022-08-153Notice of Attorney Substitution filed by Albert Bianchi, Jr for Defendant Office of Information and Privacy. Attorney Leslie K. Herje terminated. (Bianchi, Albert) (Entered: 08/15/2022)
2022-08-154ANSWER by Defendant Office of Information and Privacy. (Bianchi, Albert) (Entered: 08/15/2022)
2022-08-16Set Telephone Pretrial : Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 9/13/2022 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [ Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (voc) (Entered: 08/16/2022)
2022-09-085Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Behm, Lili) (Entered: 09/08/2022)
2022-09-15Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 9/13/2022 [:10] (cak) (Entered: 09/15/2022)
2022-09-156Pretrial Conference Order - Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge William M. Conley attached. Dispositive Motions due 6/6/2023. Motions in Limine due 10/6/2023. Responses due 10/20/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/31/2023 at 02:30 PM. Court Trial set for 11/13/2023 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/15/22. (jat) (Entered: 09/15/2022)
2022-09-15Set Deadlines: First Joint Report due 11/1/2022. (jat) (Entered: 09/15/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar