Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAmerican Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California v. United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
DistrictCentral District of California
CityWestern Division - Los Angeles
Case Number2:2022cv04760
Date Filed2022-07-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr
PlaintiffAmerican Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California
Case DescriptionThe ACLU of Southern California submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning the treatment of hospitalized detainees and detainees released from custody prior to their death. The ACLU of Southern California also requested expediting processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency granted the ACLU's request for a fee waive but denied its request for expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the ACLU of Southern California filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Fees, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-07-121COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33617094 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C) (Attorney Laboni A. Hoq added to party American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California(pty:pla))(Hoq, Laboni) (Entered: 07/12/2022)
2022-07-122CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California. (Hoq, Laboni) (Entered: 07/12/2022)
2022-07-123NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California, identifying American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California; United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement; United States Department of Homeland Security. (Hoq, Laboni) (Entered: 07/12/2022)
2022-07-124Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California. (Hoq, Laboni) (Entered: 07/12/2022)
2022-07-135NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (lh) (Entered: 07/13/2022)
2022-07-136NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 07/13/2022)
2022-07-137Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 07/13/2022)
2022-07-138NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request 4 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect days for defendant to serve a response. If the case is filed under the Freedom of Information Act, "Within 30 days" should be reflected on summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lh) (Entered: 07/13/2022)
2022-07-139NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Eunice Cho. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh) (Entered: 07/13/2022)
2022-07-1310CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr) (Entered: 07/13/2022)
2022-07-1811*STRICKEN - SEE DKT. NO. 13 * APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Eunice H. Cho to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33649209) filed by Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Kaufman, Michael) Modified on 7/20/2022 (jgr). (Entered: 07/18/2022)
2022-07-1912NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Eunice H. Cho to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33649209) 11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed for either applicant or local counsel. See Instructions for Applicants (1). Failed to list DC Bar membership. (lt) (Entered: 07/19/2022)
2022-07-2013RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The document (Dkt. No. 11 ) is stricken without prejudice to refiling in accordance with the Local Rules and regulations as indicated in the notice to filer of deficiencies (Dkt. No. 12 ). (jgr) (Entered: 07/20/2022)
2022-07-2014APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Eunice H. Cho to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 7/18/2022, Receipt No. ACACDC-33649209) filed by Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 G-64 Payment Confirmation) (Kaufman, Michael) (Entered: 07/20/2022)
2022-07-2115Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California. (Kaufman, Michael) (Entered: 07/21/2022)
2022-07-2216ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Eunice H. Cho to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California, designating Michael B. Kaufman as local counsel 14 . (gk) (Entered: 07/25/2022)
2022-07-2517NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Complaint 1 . The following error(s) was found: Separate attachments should clearly identify which sections of the summons the attachments belong to. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (gk) (Entered: 07/25/2022)
2022-07-2618Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California. (Kaufman, Michael) (Entered: 07/26/2022)
2022-07-281930-Day Summons Issued re Complaint 1 as to Defendants United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Department of Homeland Security. (gk) (Entered: 07/28/2022)
2022-08-1120PROOF OF SERVICE Executed American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Receptionist. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Individual. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Receptionist. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons returned. (Kaufman, Michael) (Entered: 08/11/2022)
2022-08-2521STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to United States Department of Homeland Security answer now due 9/30/2022; United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement answer now due 9/30/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Defendants United States Department of Homeland Security; United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Attorney Joseph William Tursi added to party United States Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph William Tursi added to party United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement(pty:dft))(Tursi, Joseph) (Entered: 08/25/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar