Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv02014
Date Filed2022-07-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffPROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST
Case DescriptionProtect the Public's Trust submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning the ethics obligations of political appointees of the Biden administration. After hearing nothing from the agency for a year, PPT contacted the Justice Department. The agency told PPT that it had not received the original request. PPT resubmitted the request. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, PPT filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-07-121COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9363614) filed by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Summons U.S. Attorney's Office, # 3 Summons Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons Summons- DOJ)(Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 07/12/2022)
2022-07-14Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (znmg) (Entered: 07/14/2022)
2022-07-152SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsss) (Entered: 07/15/2022)
2022-08-023NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth A. Adebonojo on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/02/2022)
2022-08-154Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Answer or Other Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/15/2022)
2022-08-15MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Consent 4 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall file its Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by September 16, 2022. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 08/15/2022. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 08/15/2022)
2022-09-165ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/16/2022)
2022-09-19MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall confer and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by October 3, 2022. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/19/2022. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 09/19/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar