Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY FOUNDATION v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv02015
Date Filed2022-07-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffAMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionAmericans for Prosperity Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning the formation of the Disinformation Governance Board. APF also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency APF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-07-121COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9363626) filed by AMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Errata 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet, # 9 Summons Civil Process Clerk, # 10 Summons U.S. Att'y Gen., # 11 Summons Dep't of Homeland Sec.)(Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 07/12/2022)
2022-07-122LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY FOUNDATION (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 07/12/2022)
2022-07-12Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zmh) (Entered: 07/12/2022)
2022-07-123SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmh) (Entered: 07/12/2022)
2022-07-154RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/14/2022. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 07/15/2022)
2022-07-155RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 7/13/2022 (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 07/15/2022)
2022-07-186RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/12/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/11/2022. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 07/18/2022)
2022-07-267NOTICE of Appearance by Eric R. Bolinder on behalf of AMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY FOUNDATION (Bolinder, Eric) (Entered: 07/26/2022)
2022-08-018NOTICE of Appearance by Dedra Seibel Curteman on behalf of All Defendants (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 08/01/2022)
2022-08-019Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 08/01/2022)
2022-08-01MINUTE ORDER: The Court grants the 9 Consent Motion for Enlargement of Time. Defendant shall respond to the complaint on or before September 12, 2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/1/2022. (lccrc3) (Entered: 08/01/2022)
2022-09-1210ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 09/12/2022)
2022-09-14MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by September 28, 2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 09/14/2022. (lccrc3) (Entered: 09/14/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar