Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS UNITED v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv02019
Date Filed2022-07-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffCITIZENS UNITED
Case DescriptionCitizens United submitted a FOIA for records concerning emails sent to or from several officials concerning the creation of the Disinformation Governance Board. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Citizens United filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-07-121COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9364016) filed by CITIZENS UNITED. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons to Attorney General, # 5 Summons to DHS, # 6 Summons to U.S. Attorney)(Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 07/12/2022)
2022-07-122LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS UNITED (Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 07/12/2022)
2022-07-14Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zmh) (Entered: 07/14/2022)
2022-07-153SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsss) (Entered: 07/15/2022)
2022-08-164NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth A. Adebonojo on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/16/2022)
2022-08-255Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Answer or Other Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/25/2022)
2022-08-25MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Consent Motion to Extend Time: It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED, and that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before September 27, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/25/2022. (lcrc2) (Entered: 08/25/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar