Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleColorado Wild Public Lands v. U.S. Department of the Interior et al
DistrictDistrict of Colorado
CityDenver
Case Number1:2022cv01739
Date Filed2022-07-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Daniel D. Domenico
PlaintiffColorado Wild Public Lands
Case DescriptionColorado Wild Public Lands submitted a FOIA request for records concerning the Blue Ranch Land Exchange and the associated EIS process being undertaken by the Bureau of Land Management. The agency acknowledged of the request. The agency disclosed 609 pages in full but withheld 91 pages under Exemption 5 (privileges). COWPL filed an administrative appeal. After hearing nothing further from the agency COWPL filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantU.S. Bureau of Land Management an agency of the United States
DefendantU.S. Department of the Interior an agency of the United States
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-07-131COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8551339)Attorney Jeffrey C. Parsons added to party Colorado Wild Public Lands(pty:pla), filed by Colorado Wild Public Lands. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit July 13 2021 FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit August 10 2021 FOIA Response, # 3 Exhibit August 27 2021 FOIA Response, # 4 Exhibit December 13 2021 FOIA Appeal, # 5 Exhibit February 28 2022 Letter to US DOI, # 6 Summons Summons US Attorney General, # 7 Summons Summons US Attorney District of Colorado, # 8 Summons Summons US BLM, # 9 Summons Summons US DOI, # 10 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Parsons, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/13/2022)
2022-07-132Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 07/14/2022)
2022-07-143SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, ) (Entered: 07/14/2022)
2022-07-144ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re: 1 Complaint,, filed by attorney Jeffrey C. Parsons. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Manage my Account tab at the PACER website at https://www.pacer.gov/, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (jtorr, ) (Entered: 07/14/2022)
2022-07-155MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 7/15/2022. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-01739-NRN . (trvo, ) (Entered: 07/15/2022)
2022-07-156Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (trvo, ) (Entered: 07/15/2022)
2022-07-157ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 15 July 2022. Consent Form due by 10/25/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/1/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 11/8/2022 11:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 07/15/2022)
2022-08-038NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Julia M. Prochazka on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Julia M. Prochazka added to party U.S. Bureau of Land Management(pty:dft), Attorney Julia M. Prochazka added to party U.S. Department of the Interior(pty:dft) (Prochazka, Julia) (Entered: 08/03/2022)
2022-08-169SUMMONS Returned Executed by Colorado Wild Public Lands. All Defendants. (Parsons, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/16/2022)
2022-08-2210ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, by U.S. Bureau of Land Management, U.S. Department of the Interior.(Prochazka, Julia) (Entered: 08/22/2022)
2022-08-2911CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants U.S. Bureau of Land Management, U.S. Department of the Interior All parties do not consent.. (Prochazka, Julia) (Entered: 08/29/2022)
2022-08-2912CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to 11 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-01739-DDD. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 08/29/2022)
2022-08-2913ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 8/29/2022. Text Only Entry. (rkeec) (Entered: 08/29/2022)
2022-09-0614ORDER REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This matter has its factual nexus in Pitkin County. According to the Court's Revised Jury Plan for Random Jury Selection, this case is therefore properly designated for Jury Division 3. Because the jury will be drawn from that Division, it is appropriate that the case be managed, for pretrial purposes, by Magistrate Judge Gallagher in Grand Junction. Accordingly, pursuant to D.C. Colo. L. Civ. R. 40.1(a), and as approved by the Chief Judge of the Court, the Clerk of the Court is directed to reassign this action to Magistrate Judge Gallagher as the referral judge. All further pleadings in this case must reflect the case number of 1:22-cv-01739-DDD-GPG. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 9/6/2022. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, ) (Entered: 09/06/2022)
2022-09-2115ORDER: Scheduling Conference which had been set for 11/8/2022 11:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter is hereby VACATED. Scheduling Conference re-set for 11/9/2022 at 11:30 AM in Room 323 (Grand Junction) before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/2/2022. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 363-4749, Access Code 3136546# at the scheduled time. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on September 21, 2022. Text Only Entry (gpgsec, ) (Entered: 09/21/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar