Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWHITE COAT WASTE PROJECT v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv02055
Date Filed2022-07-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffWHITE COAT WASTE PROJECT
Case DescriptionWhite Coat Waste Project submitted a FOIA request to the National Institute of Health for records concerning the agency's use of dogs in experiments. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, WCWP filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-07-131COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9366163) filed by WHITE COAT WASTE PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 07/13/2022)
2022-07-132LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WHITE COAT WASTE PROJECT (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 07/13/2022)
2022-07-15Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zmh) (Entered: 07/15/2022)
2022-07-153SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmh) (Entered: 07/15/2022)
2022-09-144NOTICE of Appearance by Derek S. Hammond on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 09/14/2022)
2022-09-145ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 09/14/2022)
2022-09-156ORDER. Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before September 28, 2022. The Joint Status Report shall include (1) the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion to stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force, 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/15/2022. (lcapm3) (Entered: 09/15/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar