Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFUNCTIONAL GOVERNMENT INITIATIVE v. UNITED STATES CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv02069
Date Filed2022-07-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Jia M. Cobb
PlaintiffFUNCTIONAL GOVERNMENT INITIATIVE
Case DescriptionFunctional Government Initiative submitted a FOIA request to the Consumer Financial Protection Agency for records concerning discussions concerning bank mergers. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency indicated that it had processed responsive records but after hearing nothing further from the agency, FGI filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantConsumer Financial Protection
DefendantUNITED STATES CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-07-141COMPLAINT FUNCTIONAL GOVERNMENT INITIATIVE against UNITED STATES CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9369187) filed by FUNCTIONAL GOVERNMENT INITIATIVE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney's Office for D.C.)(Goeken, Richard) Modified on 7/15/2022 to edit docket text (znmg). (Entered: 07/14/2022)
2022-07-142REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE for the U.S. Consumer Financial Protection Bureau filed by FUNCTIONAL GOVERNMENT INITIATIVE.(Goeken, Richard) (Entered: 07/14/2022)
2022-07-15Case Assigned to Judge Jia M. Cobb. (znmg) (Entered: 07/15/2022)
2022-07-183SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmrl) (Main Document 3 replaced on 7/18/2022 to add dates) (zmh). (Entered: 07/18/2022)
2022-08-124NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Silverman on behalf of All Defendants (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 08/12/2022)
2022-08-245ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU.(Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 08/24/2022)
2022-08-25MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the Parties confer and submit a joint proposed schedule for further proceedings, which shall include a proposed schedule for briefing dispositive motions by September 8, 2022. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on August 25, 2022. (lcjmc3) (Entered: 08/25/2022)
2022-08-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Meet & Confer Statement due by 9/8/2022. (zgdf) (Entered: 09/01/2022)
2022-09-086Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU. (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 09/08/2022)
2022-09-087Amended ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU.(Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 09/08/2022)
2022-09-128SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint status report due on November 9, 2022. See document for scheduling order and information concerning case procedures. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on 9/12/2022. (lcjmc3) (Entered: 09/12/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar