Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCHAMBER OF COMMERCE OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv02070
Date Filed2022-07-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffCHAMBER OF COMMERCE OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case DescriptionThe Chamber of Commerce of the United States submitted four FOIA requests to the Federal Trade Commission for records concerning the improper votes cast by Rohit Chopra after he left his position as a commissioner at the FTC to take over the Consumer Protection Financial Bureau. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but hearing nothing further from the agency, the Chamber of Commerce filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-07-141COMPLAINT against FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9369228) filed by CHAMBER OF COMMERCE OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A, # 2 Exhibit Ex. B, # 3 Exhibit Ex. C, # 4 Exhibit Ex. D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons DOJ summons, # 7 Summons FTC summons, # 8 Summons USA summons)(Harris, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/14/2022)
2022-07-142NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey M. Harris on behalf of CHAMBER OF COMMERCE OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Harris, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/14/2022)
2022-07-143NOTICE of Appearance by Frank Hyok Chang on behalf of CHAMBER OF COMMERCE OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Chang, Frank) (Entered: 07/14/2022)
2022-07-15Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (znmg) (Entered: 07/15/2022)
2022-07-154STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/15/2022. (lctnm3) (Entered: 07/15/2022)
2022-07-185Case randomly reassigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. Judge Trevor N. McFadden is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 07/18/2022)
2022-07-186SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmrl) (Entered: 07/18/2022)
2022-07-207LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CHAMBER OF COMMERCE OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Harris, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/20/2022)
2022-07-278RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/22/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/21/2022.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/22/2022., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION served on 7/22/2022 (Harris, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/27/2022)
2022-08-179NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas C. Dreier on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 08/17/2022)
2022-08-1710Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 08/17/2022)
2022-08-17MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Unopposed 10 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall file its Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by September 21, 2022. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 08/17/2022. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 08/17/2022)
2022-08-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 9/21/2022. (nbn) (Entered: 08/18/2022)
2022-09-2111ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION.(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 09/21/2022)
2022-09-22MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall confer and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by October 6, 2022. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/22/2022. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 09/22/2022)
2022-09-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 10/6/2022. (nbn) (Entered: 09/22/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar