Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN v. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv02077
Date Filed2022-07-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffAMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN
Case DescriptionAmerican Wild Horse Campaign submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning GonaCon, a restricted use chemical by only government authorities or the agents to prevent wild horse reproduction. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, AWHC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-07-141COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9370769) filed by AMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to BLM, # 3 Summons to USAG, # 4 Summons to USAO, # 5 Exhibit 1- Request, # 6 Exhibit 2- BLM Acknowledgment, # 7 Exhibit 3- January ECD, # 8 Exhibit 4- February ECD, # 9 Exhibit 5- March ECD, # 10 Exhibit 6- May ECD, # 11 Exhibit 7- July ECD, # 12 Exhibit 8- FOIA Online Portal)(Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 07/14/2022)
2022-07-18Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zmh) (Entered: 07/18/2022)
2022-07-182STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/18/2022. (lctnm3) (Entered: 07/18/2022)
2022-07-183SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmrl) (Entered: 07/18/2022)
2022-08-024NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Silverman on behalf of All Defendants (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 08/02/2022)
2022-08-175ANSWER to Complaint by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT.(Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 08/17/2022)
2022-08-17MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court are a Complaint and an Answer in this FOIA case. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule should address, among other things, the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents Plaintiff requests, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, and a briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if required. The parties shall file the schedule on or before September 17, 2022. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/17/2022. (lctnm3) (Entered: 08/17/2022)
2022-08-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/17/2022. (hmc) (Entered: 08/17/2022)
2022-09-156Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 09/15/2022)
2022-09-16MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the 6 Joint Status Report, the Court ORDERS the parties to file another Joint Status Report on or before December 19, 2022. The Court directs the parties' attention to the Court's 8/17/2022 Minute Order, which also instructed the parties to inform the Court whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely and whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case. The parties shall include this information in their next Report. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 9/16/2022. (lctnm3) (Entered: 09/16/2022)
2022-09-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/19/2022. (hmc) (Entered: 09/19/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar