Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWHITE COAT WASTE PROJECT v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv02078
Date Filed2022-07-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffWHITE COAT WASTE PROJECT
Case DescriptionWhite Coat Waste Project submitted a FOIA request to the National Institute of Health for records concerning procurement and shipping records for dogs obtained under contract by the NIH. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency told WCWP that it would redact identifying information of NIH employees. WCWP agreed. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, WCWP filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-07-141COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9371069) filed by WHITE COAT WASTE PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 07/14/2022)
2022-07-142LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WHITE COAT WASTE PROJECT (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 07/14/2022)
2022-07-18Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zmh) (Entered: 07/18/2022)
2022-07-193ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 7/19/2022. (DM) (Entered: 07/19/2022)
2022-07-204SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsss) (Entered: 07/20/2022)
2022-08-235NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie R. Johnson on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 08/23/2022)
2022-08-296Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 08/29/2022)
2022-08-29MINUTE ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendants 6 Consent Motion for an Extension of Time to File a Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Although Defendant represents that its deadline to answer Plaintiff's complaint is September 1, 2022, because Plaintiff has not filed an affidavit of service, the Court cannot itself determine Defendant's deadline. Accordingly, Plaintiff shall file its affidavit of service on or before September 2, 2022 . In the meantime, Defendants 6 Consent Motion for an Extension of Time to File a Response to Plaintiff's Complaint is HELD IN ABEYANCE . Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 29, 2022. (lcckk1) (Entered: 08/29/2022)
2022-08-307RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/15/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/14/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service on U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, # 2 Proof of Service on U.S. Attorney General)(Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 08/30/2022)
2022-08-308RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 8/1/2022, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/01/2022. (See Docket Entry 7 to view document) (zjm) (Entered: 09/01/2022)
2022-08-31MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received and reviewed Plaintiff's 7 Affidavit of Service. In consideration thereof, and upon good cause shown, Defendant's 6 Consent Motion for an Extension of Time to File a Response to Plaintiff's Complaint is GRANTED . Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's 1 complaint on or before October 3, 2022 . Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 31, 2022. (lcckk1) (Entered: 08/31/2022)
2022-08-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's 1 complaint on or before 10/3/2022. (dot) (Entered: 08/31/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar