Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCLEAN AIR COUNCIL v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR et al
DistrictEastern District of Pennsylvania
CityPhiladelphia
Case Number2:2022cv02741
Date Filed2022-07-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER
PlaintiffCLEAN AIR COUNCIL
Case DescriptionThe Clean Air Council submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Interior for records concerning the engineering report prepared by Philadelphia Gas Works related to a project PGW was working on with the National Park Service. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and indicated that it was processing the request. CAC filed an administrative appeal. After hearing nothing further from the agency, CAC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR
DefendantNATIONAL PARK SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-07-141COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16044560.), filed by CLEAN AIR COUNCIL. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Designation Form)(Cohen, Paul) (Entered: 07/14/2022)
2022-07-182Summons Issued as to NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (rf, ) (Entered: 07/18/2022)
2022-07-263Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (rf, ) (Entered: 07/26/2022)
2022-08-044AFFIDAVIT of Service by Stephen Ballentine re: served Summons and Complaint upon U.S. Department of Interior, National Park Service, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorney's Office for E.D. Pa. by USPS Certified Mail on 08/01/2022 (Cohen, Paul) (Entered: 08/04/2022)
2022-08-105NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Joseph Anthony Ingrao on behalf of CLEAN AIR COUNCIL(Ingrao, Joseph) (Entered: 08/10/2022)
2022-08-116NOTICE of Appearance by MARK J. SHERER on behalf of NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR with Certificate of Service(SHERER, MARK) (Entered: 08/11/2022)
2022-08-177ORDER RE: THIS MATTER SHALL BE HELD IN ABEYANCE; DEFENDANT SHALL PRODUCE NON-EXEMPT RECORDS RESPONSIVE TO PLAINTIFF'S FOIA REQUEST; DEFENDANT SHALL COMPLETE ITS RESPONSE TO THE FOIA REQUEST; IN THE EVENT THIS CASE IS NOT RESOLVED BY NOVEMBER 29, 2022, THE PARTIES SHALL FILE A JOINT STATUS UPDATE ON OR BEFORE NOVEMBER 29, 2022. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 8/15/2022. 8/17/2022 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl) (Entered: 08/17/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar