Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDANTZLER v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv02003
Date Filed2022-07-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffOSCAR DANTZLER
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE
DefendantTHE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE
DefendantMERRICK B. GARLAND The United States Department of Justice Office, individually and in his compacity as the U.S. Attorney General, and their agents one-five
DefendantCLAIBORNE W. BROWN, L.L.C. Individually and in his capacity as an attorney
DefendantCASHE COUDRAIN & BASS, LLP Through Andre Coudrain individually and in his capacity as an attorney
DefendantCASHE COUDRAIN & BASS, LLP Through Ashley Edwards Bass individually and in her capacity as an attorney
DefendantCASHE COUDRAIN & BASS, LLP Indigo K. Diekmann individually and in her capacity as an associate attorney with Cashe Coudrain & Bass, LLP
DefendantCASHE COUDRAIN & BASS, LLP Through Jamie Polozola Gomez individually and in her capacity as an associate attorney with Cashe Coudrain & Bass, LLP, and their agents one through five
DefendantUNITED STATES EASTERN COURT Through Jay Z. Zainey individually and in his capacity as a federal judge
DefendantUNITED STATES EASTERN DISTRICT COURT Through Janis Van Meerveld individually and in her capacity as a federal judge
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-07-111PETITION for Writ of Mandamus ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 202601) filed by OSCAR DANTZLER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Summons)(zmh) Modified receipt number on 7/18/2022 (znmw). (Entered: 07/15/2022)
2022-07-15Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zmh) (Entered: 07/15/2022)
2022-07-15Summons (9) Issued as to CASHE COUDRAIN & BASS, LLP(Through Ashley Edwards Bass individually and in her capacity as an attorney), CASHE COUDRAIN & BASS, LLP(Indigo K. Diekmann individually and in her capacity as an associate attorney with Cashe Coudrain & Bass, LLP), CASHE COUDRAIN & BASS, LLP(Through Jamie Polozola Gomez individually and in her capacity as an associate attorney with Cashe Coudrain & Bass, LLP, and their agents one through five ), CASHE COUDRAIN & BASS, LLP(Through Andre Coudrain individually and in his capacity as an attorney), CLAIBORNE W. BROWN, L.L.C., MERRICK B. GARLAND, THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE. Summonses and notice of consent were sent to pro se plaintiff address. (zmh) (Entered: 07/15/2022)
2022-07-182MOTION for CM/ECF Password to E-File CM/ECF Pleadings by OSCAR DANTZLER. (zjm) (Entered: 07/18/2022)
2022-07-25MINUTE ORDER granting 2 Plaintiff's Motion for a CM/ECF Password. Plaintiff shall complete the Clerk's Office on-line tutorial. The Court expects all electronic filings by pro se litigants to comply with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and this Court's Local Rules. See https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/court-info/local-rules-and-orders/local-rules. Non-compliant filings may be stricken. SO ORDERED by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/25/2022. (lccrc1) (Entered: 07/25/2022)
2022-07-253SUMMONS (9) Issued Electronically as to CASHE COUDRAIN & BASS, LLP(Through Ashley Edwards Bass individually and in her capacity as an attorney), CASHE COUDRAIN & BASS, LLP(Indigo K. Diekmann individually and in her capacity as an associate attorney with Cashe Coudrain & Bass, LLP), CASHE COUDRAIN & BASS, LLP(Through Jamie Polozola Gomez individually and in her capacity as an associate attorney with Cashe Coudrain & Bass, LLP, and their agents one through five ), CASHE COUDRAIN & BASS, LLP(Through Andre Coudrain individually and in his capacity as an attorney), CLAIBORNE W. BROWN, L.L.C., MERRICK B. GARLAND, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE, UNITED STATES EASTERN COURT, UNITED STATES EASTERN DISTRICT COURT. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 07/25/2022)
2022-07-294AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Mandamus filed by OSCAR DANTZLER.(zjm) (Entered: 07/29/2022)
2022-09-015MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice of the Defendants, The U.S. Department of Justice Office, and The U.S. Department of Justice Office through the Attorney General, Merrick B. Garland Individually and in his capacity as the U.S. Attorney General sand their Agents one - five and The U.S. District Judge Jay Zainey and the U.S. Magistrate Judge Hanis Van Meerveld by OSCAR DANTZLER. (zjm) (Entered: 09/01/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar