Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR IMMIGRATION STUDIES v. U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv02089
Date Filed2022-07-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffCENTER FOR IMMIGRATION STUDIES
Case DescriptionThe Center for Immigration Studies submitted a FOIA request for records concerning the announcement that agency was reverting to its 2008-2009 civics test. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, CIS filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
DefendantUNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-07-151COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9374240) filed by CENTER FOR IMMIGRATION STUDIES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Edlow, Joseph) (Entered: 07/15/2022)
2022-07-152LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR IMMIGRATION STUDIES (Edlow, Joseph) (Entered: 07/15/2022)
2022-07-18Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (znmg) (Entered: 07/18/2022)
2022-07-183STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 18, 2022. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 07/18/2022)
2022-07-194SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsss) (Entered: 07/19/2022)
2022-08-085RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/03/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt, # 2 Exhibit USPS Tracker Printout)(Edlow, Joseph) (Entered: 08/08/2022)
2022-08-086RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/3/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/2/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt, # 2 Exhibit USPS Tracker Printout)(Edlow, Joseph) (Entered: 08/08/2022)
2022-08-087RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 8/8/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt, # 2 Exhibit USPS Tracker Printout)(Edlow, Joseph) Modified docket text on 8/9/2022 (zed). (Entered: 08/08/2022)
2022-09-018Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, with proposed order by U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 09/01/2022)
2022-09-01MINUTE ORDER granting the defendant's 8 Consent Motion to Extend Defendant's Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. The defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's complaint on or before October 3, 2022. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 1, 2022. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 09/01/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar