Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGale Construction Company v. United States Army Corps of Engineers, Jacksonville District
DistrictMiddle District of Florida
CityJacksonville
Case Number3:2022cv00782
Date Filed2022-07-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Corrigan
PlaintiffGale Construction Company
Case DescriptionGale Construction Company submitted a FOIA request to the U.S. Army Corps of Engineers for records concerning the contract awarded to Treviicos South, Inc. for work on the Herbert Hoover Dike Cutoff Wall construction, for which Gale was a subcontractor. Gale submitted three pared down requests. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Gale Construction filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Fees

DefendantUnited States Army Corps of Engineers, Jacksonville District
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-07-151COMPLAINT against United States Army Corps of Engineers, Jacksonville District (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-19779634) filed by Gale Construction Company. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H)(Distel, Craig) (Entered: 07/15/2022)
2022-07-182NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:22-cv-0782-TJC-PDB. (SJB) (Entered: 07/18/2022)
2022-07-183PROPOSED summons to be issued by Gale Construction Company. (Distel, Craig) (Entered: 07/18/2022)
2022-07-194NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KKH) (Entered: 07/19/2022)
2022-07-195SUMMONS issued as to United States Army Corps of Engineers, Jacksonville District. (BD) (Entered: 07/19/2022)
2022-08-026SUMMONS returned executed by Gale Construction Company. United States Army Corps of Engineers, Jacksonville District served on 7/22/2022, answer due 9/20/2022. (Distel, Craig) (Entered: 08/02/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar