Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv02097
Date Filed2022-07-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted three FOIA requests to the U.S. Secret Service for records concerning the use of security and/or other services for Hunter Biden and any travel companions on international travel. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and indicated that it had completed searching for one request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-07-171COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9375764) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 4 Summons U.S. Dep't of Homeland Security)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 07/17/2022)
2022-07-172LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 07/17/2022)
2022-07-19Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zmh) (Entered: 07/19/2022)
2022-07-193NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren M. Burke on behalf of JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 07/19/2022)
2022-07-214SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmrl) (Entered: 07/21/2022)
2022-08-105RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/21/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/20/2022.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/26/2022., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 7/25/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Cristina Rotaru)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 08/10/2022)
2022-08-186NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher D. Edelman on behalf of All Defendants (Edelman, Christopher) (Entered: 08/18/2022)
2022-08-187Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edelman, Christopher) (Entered: 08/18/2022)
2022-08-30MINUTE ORDER granting Consent MOTION 7 for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading ; Set/Reset Deadlines: It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and that defendant shall file a responsive pleading by 09/09/2022. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 08/30/2022. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 08/30/2022)
2022-09-098ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Edelman, Christopher) (Entered: 09/09/2022)
2022-09-129ORDER: Defendant is hereby ORDERED to file a Vaughn index and supporting dispositive motion within 30 days. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 09/12/2022. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 09/12/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar