Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR IMMIGRATION STUDIES v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv02107
Date Filed2022-07-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffCENTER FOR IMMIGRATION STUDIES
Case DescriptionThe Center for Immigration Studies submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning the announcement of a new Temporary Protected Status Designation for Haiti. The agency acknowledged receipt of the agency but after hearing nothing further from the agency, CIS filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
TERMINATED: 09/14/2022
DefendantU.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-07-181COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9377879) filed by CENTER FOR IMMIGRATION STUDIES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Edlow, Joseph) (Entered: 07/18/2022)
2022-07-182LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR IMMIGRATION STUDIES (Edlow, Joseph) (Entered: 07/18/2022)
2022-07-19Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zmh) (Entered: 07/19/2022)
2022-07-193STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/19/2022. (lctnm3) (Entered: 07/19/2022)
2022-07-214SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmrl) (Entered: 07/21/2022)
2022-08-055RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/03/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt, # 2 Exhibit USPS Tracker Printout)(Edlow, Joseph) (Entered: 08/05/2022)
2022-08-056RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/3/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/2/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt, # 2 Exhibit USPS Tracker Printout)(Edlow, Joseph) (Entered: 08/05/2022)
2022-08-057RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 8/5/2022; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 8/1/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt (DHS), # 2 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt (USCIS), # 3 Exhibit USPS Tracker Printout (DHS), # 4 Exhibit USPS Tracker Printout (USCIS))(Edlow, Joseph) Modified docket text on 8/10/2022 (zed). (Entered: 08/05/2022)
2022-08-298NOTICE of Appearance by Dedra Seibel Curteman on behalf of All Defendants (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 08/29/2022)
2022-08-299Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 08/29/2022)
2022-08-30MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendants' Answer shall be due on or before October 17, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/30/2022. (lctnm3) (Entered: 08/30/2022)
2022-08-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 10/17/2022. (hmc) (Entered: 08/30/2022)
2022-09-1410NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re U.S. Department of Homeland Security (Edlow, Joseph) (Entered: 09/14/2022)
2022-09-14MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the 10 Notice of Voluntary Partial Dismissal Without Prejudice, this case is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice as to Defendant Department of Homeland Security. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). This dismissal shall have no effect on the remaining Defendant, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 9/14/2022. (lctnm3) (Entered: 09/14/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar