Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-07-18 | 1 | COMPLAINT against JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9379279) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Dep't of Health & Human Services, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 07/18/2022) |
2022-07-18 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 07/18/2022) |
2022-07-19 | | Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (znmg) (Entered: 07/19/2022) |
2022-07-19 | 3 | STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 19, 2022. (lcbah1) (Entered: 07/19/2022) |
2022-07-21 | 4 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmrl) (Entered: 07/21/2022) |
2022-08-10 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/21/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/20/2022.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/26/2022., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 7/25/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Cristina Rotaru)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 08/10/2022) |
2022-08-22 | 6 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 08/22/2022) |
2022-09-19 | 7 | Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 09/19/2022) |
2022-09-20 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 7 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit a joint status report by December 5, 2022. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 20, 2022. (lcbah1) (Entered: 09/20/2022) |
2022-09-20 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/5/2022. (hmc) (Entered: 09/20/2022) |
2022-12-05 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 12/05/2022) |
2022-12-05 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 8 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit a join status report by March 6, 2023. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on December 5, 2022. (lcbah1) (Entered: 12/05/2022) |
2022-12-06 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/6/2023. (ztg) (Entered: 12/06/2022) |
2023-03-06 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 03/06/2023) |
2023-03-07 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit a join status report by June 12, 2023. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 7, 2023. (lcbah1) (Entered: 03/07/2023) |
2023-03-07 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/12/2023. (ztg) (Entered: 03/07/2023) |
2023-06-12 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 06/12/2023) |
2023-06-14 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit a joint status report by September 12, 2023. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 14, 2023. (lcbah1) (Entered: 06/14/2023) |
2023-06-14 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/12/2023. (ztg) (Entered: 06/14/2023) |
2023-09-11 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 09/11/2023) |
2023-09-11 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit a joint status report by December 12, 2023. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 11, 2023. (lcbah1) (Entered: 09/11/2023) |
2023-09-12 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties Joint Status Report due by 12/12/2023 (mac) (Entered: 09/12/2023) |
2023-10-24 | 12 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Kaitlin Kerry Eckrote on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Substituting for attorney Sean M. Tepe (Eckrote, Kaitlin) (Entered: 10/24/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |