Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNATIONAL PUBLIC RADIO, INC. et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv02113
Date Filed2022-07-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffNATIONAL PUBLIC RADIO, INC.
PlaintiffJINGNAN HUO
Case DescriptionJingnan Hao, an associate producer at National Public Radio, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning the allocation of vaccines and the delivery and administration of vaccine doses. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, NPR filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-07-181COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief for Violation of the Freedom of Information Act against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9379396) filed by NATIONAL PUBLIC RADIO, INC., JINGNAN HUO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B to Complaint, # 3 Exhibit C to Complaint, # 4 Exhibit D Complaint, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons as to U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, # 7 Summons as to U.S. Department of Justice, # 8 Summons as to United States Attorney's Office)(DeThomas, Courtney) (Entered: 07/18/2022)
2022-07-182LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JINGNAN HUO, NATIONAL PUBLIC RADIO, INC. (DeThomas, Courtney) (Entered: 07/18/2022)
2022-07-19Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (znmg) (Entered: 07/19/2022)
2022-07-213SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmrl) (Entered: 07/21/2022)
2022-07-294MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Thomas R. Burke, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9405352. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JINGNAN HUO, NATIONAL PUBLIC RADIO, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(DeThomas, Courtney) (Entered: 07/29/2022)
2022-07-295RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/27/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/26/2022. (DeThomas, Courtney) (Entered: 07/29/2022)
2022-08-01MINUTE ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave of Thomas R. Burke to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/1/22. (DMK) (Entered: 08/01/2022)
2022-08-016NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas R. Burke on behalf of JINGNAN HUO, NATIONAL PUBLIC RADIO, INC. (Burke, Thomas) (Entered: 08/01/2022)
2022-08-247NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen DeGenaro on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 08/24/2022)
2022-08-248Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 08/24/2022)
2022-08-24MINUTE ORDER. 8 Motion for an Extension of Time is GRANTED. Defendant must respond to the complaint by September 23, 2022. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/24/2022. (lcabj1) (Entered: 08/24/2022)
2022-09-239ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 09/23/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar