Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBloomberg L.P. et al v. United States Postal Service
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2022cv06112
Date Filed2022-07-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Denise L. Cote
PlaintiffBloomberg L.P.
PlaintiffDow Jones & Company, Inc.
Case DescriptionBloomberg, L.P. and Dow Jones submitted a request to the U.S. Postal Service for records concerning change-of-address requests submitted between January and June 2021. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and denied them under Exemption 3 (other statutes). Bloomberg and Dow Jones filed administrative appeals. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Bloomberg and Dow Jones filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Postal Service
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Opinion/Order [11]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-07-181COMPLAINT against United States Postal Service. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26429788)Document filed by Bloomberg L.P., Dow Jones & Company, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H).(Townsend, Katielynn) (Entered: 07/18/2022)
2022-07-182RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Bloomberg Inc. for Bloomberg L.P.; Corporate Parent Ruby Newco, LLC, Corporate Parent News Corporation for Dow Jones & Company, Inc.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P., Dow Jones & Company, Inc...(Townsend, Katielynn) (Entered: 07/18/2022)
2022-07-183CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Townsend, Katielynn) (Entered: 07/18/2022)
2022-07-184REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Postal Service, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P., Dow Jones & Company, Inc...(Townsend, Katielynn) (Entered: 07/18/2022)
2022-07-19CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Denise L. Cote. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(gp) (Entered: 07/19/2022)
2022-07-19Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (gp) (Entered: 07/19/2022)
2022-07-19Case Designated ECF. (gp) (Entered: 07/19/2022)
2022-07-195ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Postal Service..(gp) (Entered: 07/19/2022)
2022-07-276NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/30/2022 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 18B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/27/2022) (vfr) (Entered: 07/27/2022)
2022-08-027AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Complaint served on United States Postal Service on 7/27/22. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P., Dow Jones & Company, Inc...(Townsend, Katielynn) (Entered: 08/02/2022)
2022-08-058AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Pretrial Conference served on United States Postal Service; U.S. Attorney's Office on Aug. 2, 2022; Aug. 4, 2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P., Dow Jones & Company, Inc...(Townsend, Katielynn) (Entered: 08/05/2022)
2022-08-269ANSWER to 1 Complaint,. Document filed by United States Postal Service..(Onozawa, Tomoko) (Entered: 08/26/2022)
2022-08-3110CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Katie Townsend, Counsel for Plaintiffs dated Aug. 31, 2022. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P., Dow Jones & Company, Inc...(Townsend, Katielynn) (Entered: 08/31/2022)
2022-08-3111ORDER granting 10 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Having received on August 31, 2022 the parties' consent letter motion requesting an adjournment, it is hereby ORDERED that the initial pretrial conference is adjourned until October 21, 2022 at 9:30 A.M. Initial Conference set for 10/21/2022 at 09:30 AM before Judge Denise L. Cote.. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/31/2022) (tg) (Entered: 08/31/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar