Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleINSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH v. FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv02114
Date Filed2022-07-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffINSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH
Case DescriptionThe Institute for Energy Research submitted a FOIA request to the Federal Energy Regulatory Commission for records concerning calendar entries for four senior agency officials. IER also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency disclosed heavily redacted calendar entries, primarily under Exemption 5 (privileges). IER filed an administrative appeal. After hearing nothing further from the agency, IER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-07-191COMPLAINT against FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9379663) filed by INSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Proposed to US Attorney, US Attorney General, and FERC, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 07/19/2022)
2022-07-19Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (znmg) (Entered: 07/19/2022)
2022-07-192STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 19, 2022. (lcbah4) (Entered: 07/19/2022)
2022-07-203NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Cochran Horner on behalf of INSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH (Horner, Christopher) (Entered: 07/20/2022)
2022-07-214SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsss) (Entered: 07/21/2022)
2022-08-125NOTICE of Appearance by Benton Gregory Peterson on behalf of FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 08/12/2022)
2022-08-226ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION.(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 08/22/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar