Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv02131
Date Filed2022-07-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Case DescriptionThe Center for Biological Diversity submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Energy for records concerning the implementation of the North American Energy Resilience Model. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, CBD filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-07-201COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9383624) filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Crystal, Howard) (Entered: 07/20/2022)
2022-07-202LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Crystal, Howard) (Entered: 07/20/2022)
2022-07-203MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Augusta C.F. Wilson, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9383701. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Good Standing)(Crystal, Howard) (Entered: 07/20/2022)
2022-07-20Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (znmg) (Entered: 07/20/2022)
2022-07-204SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 07/20/2022)
2022-07-205STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 20, 2022. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 07/20/2022)
2022-07-21MINUTE ORDER granting plaintiff's 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 21, 2022. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 07/21/2022)
2022-07-286NOTICE of Appearance by Augusta Wilson on behalf of CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Wilson, Augusta) (Entered: 07/28/2022)
2022-08-187NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 08/18/2022)
2022-08-248RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/26/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/25/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit-Service Receipts)(Wilson, Augusta) (Entered: 08/24/2022)
2022-08-259ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY.(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 08/25/2022)
2022-08-25MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The status report should address the status of the plaintiff's FOIA request, including the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request and the anticipated date(s) for release of the requested documents. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before September 16, 2022. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 25, 2022. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 08/25/2022)
2022-08-26NOTICE OF ERROR re 8 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney; emailed to awilson@biologicaldiversity.org, cc'd 7 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please note the following deficiency and file/refile document as instructed , 2. Two-part document; second docket entry is required, 3. FYI: Please file Return of Service as to Federal Defendant and U.S. Attorney General. (zed, ) (Entered: 08/26/2022)
2022-08-2910RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY served on 7/25/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Service Receipt)(Wilson, Augusta) (Entered: 08/29/2022)
2022-08-2911RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/26/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/25/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Service Receipt)(Wilson, Augusta) (Entered: 08/29/2022)
2022-08-2912RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/26/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Service Receipt)(Wilson, Augusta) (Entered: 08/29/2022)
2022-09-1513Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY. (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 09/15/2022)
2022-09-15MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before December 8, 2022. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 15, 2022. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 09/15/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar