Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-07-20 | 1 | COMPLAINT against OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9384015) filed by PROJECT FOR PRIVACY AND SURVEILLANCE ACCOUNTABILITY, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons Office of the Director of National Intelligence, # 7 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 8 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia)(Schaerr, Gene) (Entered: 07/20/2022) |
2022-07-20 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROJECT FOR PRIVACY AND SURVEILLANCE ACCOUNTABILITY, INC. (Schaerr, Gene) (Entered: 07/20/2022) |
2022-07-20 | | Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zsb) (Entered: 07/20/2022) |
2022-07-21 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmrl) (Entered: 07/21/2022) |
2022-08-08 | 4 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/29/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/28/2022. (Goodwin, Scott) (Main Document 4 replaced on 8/9/2022) (zjm). (Entered: 08/08/2022) |
2022-08-08 | 5 | ERRATA by PROJECT FOR PRIVACY AND SURVEILLANCE ACCOUNTABILITY, INC. re 4 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney. (Goodwin, Scott) (Entered: 08/08/2022) |
2022-08-08 | 6 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/1/2022. (Goodwin, Scott) (Entered: 08/08/2022) |
2022-08-08 | 7 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE served on 8/5/2022 (Goodwin, Scott) (Entered: 08/08/2022) |
2022-08-29 | 8 | NOTICE of Appearance by Sian Jones on behalf of All Defendants (Jones, Sian) (Entered: 08/29/2022) |
2022-08-29 | 9 | ANSWER to Complaint by OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE.(Jones, Sian) (Entered: 08/29/2022) |
2022-09-01 | | MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by September 15, 2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 09/01/2022. (lccrc3) (Entered: 09/01/2022) |
2022-09-15 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Jones, Sian) (Entered: 09/15/2022) |
2022-10-12 | 11 | NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Field on behalf of PROJECT FOR PRIVACY AND SURVEILLANCE ACCOUNTABILITY, INC. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 10/12/2022) |
2022-11-21 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Jones, Sian) (Entered: 11/21/2022) |
2022-11-28 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby directed to submit another joint status report by December 20, 2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/28/2022. (lccrc3) (Entered: 11/28/2022) |
2022-12-20 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Jones, Sian) (Entered: 12/20/2022) |
2022-12-22 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby directed to submit another joint status report by February 21, 2023. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/22/2022. (lccrc3) (Entered: 12/22/2022) |
2023-01-12 | 14 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by L'Shauntee J. Robertson on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Sian Jones (Robertson, L'Shauntee) (Entered: 01/12/2023) |
2023-02-21 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Robertson, L'Shauntee) (Entered: 02/21/2023) |
2023-02-21 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby directed to submit another joint status report by March 21, 2023. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/21/2023. (lccrc1) (Entered: 02/21/2023) |
2023-03-21 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Robertson, L'Shauntee) (Entered: 03/21/2023) |
2023-03-22 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 16 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby directed to submit another joint status report by April 21, 2023. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 03/22/2023. (lccrc3) (Entered: 03/22/2023) |
2023-04-21 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Robertson, L'Shauntee) (Entered: 04/21/2023) |
2023-04-26 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 17 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby directed to submit another joint status report by June 21, 2023. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 04/26/2023. (lccrc3) (Entered: 04/26/2023) |
2023-06-21 | 18 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Robertson, L'Shauntee) (Entered: 06/21/2023) |
2023-06-22 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 18 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall file their Joint Status Report by June 23, 2023. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 06/22/2023. (lccrc3) (Entered: 06/22/2023) |
2023-06-23 | 19 | Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Robertson, L'Shauntee) (Entered: 06/23/2023) |
2023-06-28 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 19 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby directed to submit another joint status report by August 21, 2023. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 06/28/2023. (lccrc3) (Entered: 06/28/2023) |
2023-08-21 | 20 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by PROJECT FOR PRIVACY AND SURVEILLANCE ACCOUNTABILITY, INC.. (Schaerr, Gene) (Entered: 08/21/2023) |
2023-08-23 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 20 Plaintiff's consent Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall file their joint status report on or by August 24, 2023. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/23/2023. (lccrc3) (Entered: 08/23/2023) |
2023-08-24 | 21 | Joint STATUS REPORT by PROJECT FOR PRIVACY AND SURVEILLANCE ACCOUNTABILITY, INC.. (Schaerr, Gene) (Entered: 08/24/2023) |
2023-08-28 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 21 parties' Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby directed to submit another joint status report by September 20, 2023. In that status report, the Defendant shall provide details about the status of any remaining consultations. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/28/2023. (lccrc3) (Entered: 08/28/2023) |
2023-09-20 | 22 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Robertson, L'Shauntee) (Entered: 09/20/2023) |
2023-09-22 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 22 Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall file their Joint Status Report by September 27, 2023. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 9/22/2023. (lccrc3) (Entered: 09/22/2023) |
2023-09-27 | 23 | Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Robertson, L'Shauntee) (Entered: 09/27/2023) |
2023-10-02 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 23 parties' Joint Status Report, the Court hereby orders Defendant to complete its processing of remaining records and issue a final response by December 1, 2023. The parties are directed to file a further joint status report on or by December 15, 2023. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/2/2023. (lccrc3) (Entered: 10/02/2023) |
2023-12-15 | 24 | Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Robertson, L'Shauntee) (Entered: 12/15/2023) |
2023-12-18 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 24 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby directed to file a further joint status report by March 15, 2024. In the event disputes remain, the parties shall include a schedule for prompt briefing in the upcoming status report. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/18/2023. (lccrc3) (Entered: 12/18/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |