Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleALASKA FOREST ASSOCIATION v. U.S. FOREST SERVICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv02135
Date Filed2022-07-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffALASKA FOREST ASSOCIATION
Case DescriptionAlaska Forest Association submitted a FOIA request to the U.S. Forest Service for records concerning the Southeast Alaska Sustainability Strategy launched by the Forest Service in mid-2021. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, AFA filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. FOREST SERVICE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-07-201COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, U.S. FOREST SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9384542) filed by ALASKA FOREST ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Weis, Julie) (Entered: 07/20/2022)
2022-07-20Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zsb) (Entered: 07/20/2022)
2022-07-202LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ALASKA FOREST ASSOCIATION (Weis, Julie) (Entered: 07/20/2022)
2022-07-213SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmrl) (Entered: 07/21/2022)
2022-08-104RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/29/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/28/2022. (Weis, Julie) (Entered: 08/10/2022)
2022-08-105RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/29/2022. (Weis, Julie) (Entered: 08/10/2022)
2022-08-106RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE served on 7/28/2022 (Weis, Julie) (Entered: 08/10/2022)
2022-08-107RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. FOREST SERVICE served on 7/29/2022 (Weis, Julie) (Entered: 08/10/2022)
2022-08-228NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Aaron Caplen on behalf of All Defendants (Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 08/22/2022)
2022-08-229Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, U.S. FOREST SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 08/22/2022)
2022-08-22MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file a responsive pleading to the complaint on or before September 30, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8-22-2022. (lcrc3) (Entered: 08/22/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar