Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleTOBIAS v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv02141
Date Filed2022-07-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffJIMMY TOBIAS
Case DescriptionJournalist Jimmy Tobias submitted seven FOIA requests to the Department of Commerce for records including communications between Deputy Secretary Don Graves and the American Clean Power Association and/or the Solar Energy Industries Association. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Tobias filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-07-201COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9385003) filed by JIMMY TOBIAS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex 1-14, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/20/2022)
2022-07-202NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of JIMMY TOBIAS (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/20/2022)
2022-07-203NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Loevy on behalf of JIMMY TOBIAS (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 07/20/2022)
2022-07-20Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (znmg) (Entered: 07/20/2022)
2022-07-204SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 07/20/2022)
2022-09-165NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Anthony Quinn on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 09/16/2022)
2022-09-166Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 09/16/2022)
2022-09-19MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: 1) Defendant's Unopposed 6 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED; and 2) Defendant shall file its Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by October 19, 2022. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 09/19/2022. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 09/19/2022)
2022-09-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 10/19/2022. (nbn) (Entered: 09/20/2022)
2022-10-197ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE.(Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 10/19/2022)
2022-10-19MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall confer and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by November 2, 2022. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/19/2022. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 10/19/2022)
2022-10-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 11/2/2022. (nbn) (Entered: 10/20/2022)
2022-11-028Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 11/02/2022)
2022-11-07MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 8 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by December 2, 2022. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/07/2022. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 11/07/2022)
2022-11-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/2/2022. (nbn) (Entered: 11/08/2022)
2022-12-029Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 12/02/2022)
2022-12-02MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 9 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by February 2, 2023. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/2/2022. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 12/02/2022)
2022-12-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/2/2023. (nbn) (Entered: 12/02/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar