Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-07-21 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9387938) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Department of State, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 07/21/2022) |
2022-07-21 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 07/21/2022) |
2022-07-22 | | Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (znmg) (Entered: 07/22/2022) |
2022-07-22 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 07/22/2022) |
2022-07-22 | 4 | NOTICE of Appearance by Ramona Raula Cotca on behalf of JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 07/22/2022) |
2022-08-08 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/25/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/24/2022. (Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 08/08/2022) |
2022-08-09 | | NOTICE OF ERROR re 5 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney; emailed to rcotca@judicialwatch.org, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please note the following deficiency and file/ref (Entered: 08/09/2022) |
2022-08-10 | 6 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/25/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/24/2022.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/01/2022., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 8/1/2022 (Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 08/10/2022) |
2022-08-24 | 7 | NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas C. Dreier on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 08/24/2022) |
2022-08-24 | 8 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 08/24/2022) |
2022-08-24 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 08/24/2022) |
2022-08-24 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further status report by November 18, 2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/24/2022. (lccrc1) (Entered: 08/24/2022) |
2022-11-17 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 11/17/2022) |
2022-11-21 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further status report by February 16, 2023. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/21/2022. (lccrc1) (Entered: 11/21/2022) |
2023-02-16 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 02/16/2023) |
2023-02-17 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further status report by May 17, 2023. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/17/2023. (lccrc1) (Entered: 02/17/2023) |
2023-05-12 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 05/12/2023) |
2023-05-15 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further status report by August 10, 2023. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/15/2023. (lccrc1) (Entered: 05/15/2023) |
2023-08-10 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 08/10/2023) |
2023-08-11 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further status report by September 11, 2023. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/11/2023. (lccrc1) (Entered: 08/11/2023) |
2023-09-05 | 14 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 09/05/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |