Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCATO INSTITUTE v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv02152
Date Filed2022-07-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffCATO INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionThe Cato Institute submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning 13 identified institutions. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The FBI divided the Cato Institute's request into 13 separate requests. However, the Cato Institute only pursued its request on the Patriot Front. The FBI processed records it had already disclosed on Patriot Front and promised to make other records available online. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Cato Institute filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
935 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20535
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-07-211COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9388146) filed by CATO INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex 1-7, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/21/2022)
2022-07-212NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of CATO INSTITUTE (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/21/2022)
2022-07-213NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Loevy on behalf of CATO INSTITUTE (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 07/21/2022)
2022-07-22Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zsss) (Entered: 07/22/2022)
2022-07-224SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsss) (Entered: 07/22/2022)
2022-09-195NOTICE of Appearance by Derek S. Hammond on behalf of All Defendants (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 09/19/2022)
2022-09-196ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 09/19/2022)
2022-09-217ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendants shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of their production of documents to plaintiff, on or before October 19, 2022. See Order for details. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/21/2022. (jth) (Entered: 09/21/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar