Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv02172
Date Filed2022-07-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Defense for records concerning PowerPoint presentations used for training and/or classroom instruction discussing critical race theory. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-07-231COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9391405) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Department of Defense, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 07/23/2022)
2022-07-232LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 07/23/2022)
2022-07-25Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zsb) (Entered: 07/25/2022)
2022-07-263SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsss) (Entered: 07/26/2022)
2022-07-264NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren M. Burke on behalf of JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 07/26/2022)
2022-08-125RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/27/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/26/2022.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/03/2022., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 8/2/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Cristina Rotaru)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 08/12/2022)
2022-08-266NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 08/26/2022)
2022-08-267ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE.(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 08/26/2022)
2022-08-298ORDER. Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before this court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before September 12, 2022. The Joint Status Report shall include (1) the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force, 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 8/29/2022. (lcapm2) (Entered: 08/29/2022)
2022-09-129Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 09/12/2022)
2022-09-13MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by October 12, 2022, which advises whether any outstanding issues remain and, if so, proposes a summary judgment briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 9/13/2022. (lcapm2) (Entered: 09/13/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar