Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNumann v. Federal Bureau of Investigation
DistrictDistrict of Alaska
CityAnchorage
Case Number3:2022cv00178
Date Filed2022-08-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJoshua M. Kindred
PlaintiffGregory Numann
Case DescriptionGregory Numann submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning his criminal prosecution. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Numann filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Opinion/Order [13]
Opinion/Order [17]
Opinion/Order [21]
Opinion/Order [27]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-08-011COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relif against Federal Bureau of Investigation, filed by Gregory Numann. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/02/2022)
2022-09-132CLERK'S NOTICE: The Nature of Suit for this case is hereby changed from 895 to 550 to properly reflect that this is a prisoner civil rights action. This change is administrative in nature only. (JDS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/13/2022)
2022-09-133ORDER RE DEFICIENT FILING: Mr. Numann must either pay the filing fee of $402.00 or file the application to waive prepayment of the filing fee within 30 days of this order . Signed by Judge Joshua M. Kindred on 9/13/2022. (JDS, COURT STAFF) Modified on 9/13/2022 to replace PDF (JDS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/13/2022)
2022-10-034MOTION for Extension of Time for Summons Process by Gregory Numann. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/04/2022)
2022-10-045Receipt number 100019484 in the amount of $ 402.00 received on 10/4/22 from Gregory Todd Numan regarding Filing Fee. (BJK, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/04/2022)
2022-11-176MOTION to Supplement Complaint for Injunctive Relief re 1 Complaint by Gregory Numann. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/18/2022)
2022-11-217MOTION to Request Status of Motion for Extension of Time by Gregory Numann.(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/22/2022)
2022-12-288ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE AND RESPONSE : Plaintiff's Motion to Supplement the Complaint at Docket 6 is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Motions at Docket 4 and Docket 7 are DENIED as moot. Service of process to be completed no later than 90 days . (See order for additional details). Signed by Judge Joshua M. Kindred on 12/28/2022. (ANM, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/28/2022)
2023-01-039Unissued summons re Defendant FBI, (LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/04/2023)
2023-01-04Summons Issued as to Federal Bureau of Investigation (LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/04/2023)
2023-02-1010CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gregory Numann re Summons Issued as to USA (LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/10/2023)
2023-04-1011ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Federal Bureau of Investigation.(Glazier, Dustin) (Entered: 04/10/2023)
2023-04-1012MOTION for Summary Judgment by Gregory Numann.(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/11/2023)
2023-04-1713ORDER denying 12 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Joshua M. Kindred on 4/17/2023. (ANM, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/17/2023)
2023-04-2414**DISREGARD-ISSUED IN ERROR**ORDER RE INITIAL SCHEDULING & PLANNING CONFERENCE REPORT: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. Signed by Judge Joshua M. Kindred on 4/24/2023. (SCD, COURT STAFF) Modified on 5/17/2023 issd in err. (SCD, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/24/2023)
2023-05-0915MOTION for Summary Judgment by Gregory Numann.(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/10/2023)
2023-05-1716JMK TEXT ORDER: The Order re Initial Scheduling & Planning Conference Report at Docket 14 was issued in error. Local Civil Rules 16.1(a)(5) and (9). The Court's Order at Docket 14 is hereby RESCINDED .(SCD, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/17/2023)
2023-05-1717ORDER denying 15 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant shall file dispositive motions within 30 days . See order for additional deadlines. Signed by Judge Joshua M. Kindred on 5/17/2023. (ANM, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/17/2023)
2023-06-1318MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions (Unopposed) by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Glazier, Dustin) (Entered: 06/13/2023)
2023-06-2719ORDER granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendants must answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before 7/17/2023 . Signed by Judge Joshua M. Kindred on 6/27/23. (LMH, COURT STAFF) Modified on 6/27/2023 to correct ddl. (SCD, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/27/2023)
2023-06-2920MOTION for Stay of Complaint re 1 Complaint by Gregory Numann.(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/30/2023)
2023-07-2121ORDER granting 20 Plaintiff's Motion for Stay. Signed by Judge Joshua M. Kindred on 7/20/23. (LMH, COURT STAFF) Modified on 7/21/2023 to correct text (LMH, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/21/2023)
2023-10-0622STATUS REPORT by Gregory Numann. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/06/2023)
2023-10-1723NOTICE Defendant's Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Inform Status by Federal Bureau of Investigation re 22 Status Report (Glazier, Dustin) (Entered: 10/17/2023)
2024-01-0224STATUS REPORT by Gregory Numann. (SXH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/02/2024)
2024-01-0825NOTICE Defendant's Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Inform Status by Federal Bureau of Investigation re 24 Status Report (Glazier, Dustin) (Entered: 01/08/2024)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar