Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Nebraska v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictDistrict of Nebraska
CityLincoln
Case Number4:2022cv03161
Date Filed2022-08-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge John M. Gerrard
PlaintiffAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Nebraska
Case DescriptionThe ACLU of Nebraska submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning the Inspector General's report of an investigation of a raid by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcements agents in O'Neill, NE. The ACLU of Nebraska also requested a fee waive. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the ACLU of Nebraska filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search

DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
DefendantUnited States Department Of Homeland Security Office of Inspector General
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-08-081COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4686891), by Attorney Rosangela Godinez on behalf of ACLU Nebraska (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit B - Acknowledgment Ltr, # 3 Exhibit C - 5/20/20 email from DHS, # 4 Exhibit D - 12/18/20 email to OIG, # 5 Exhibit E - 6/30/21 email to OIG, # 6 Errata F - 2/8/22 email to OIG)(Godinez, Rosangela) (Entered: 08/08/2022)
2022-08-082NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Jane Seu on behalf of Plaintiff ACLU Nebraska (Seu, Jane) (Entered: 08/08/2022)
2022-08-083Summons Requested as to United States Department of Homeland Security Office of Inspector General regarding Complaint, 1 . (Godinez, Rosangela) (Entered: 08/08/2022)
2022-08-084Summons Requested as to United States Department of Homeland Security regarding Complaint, 1 . (Godinez, Rosangela) (Entered: 08/08/2022)
2022-08-085TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO) (Entered: 08/08/2022)
2022-08-086Summons Issued as to defendants United States Department Of Homeland Security Office of Inspector General and United States Department of Homeland Security. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO) (Entered: 08/08/2022)
2022-08-187Summons Requested as to DHS OIG General Counsel regarding Complaint, 1 . (Seu, Jane) (Entered: 08/18/2022)
2022-08-188Summons Requested as to DHS General Counsel regarding Complaint, 1 . (Seu, Jane) (Entered: 08/18/2022)
2022-08-189Summons Returned Unexecuted as to defendant All Defendants. (Seu, Jane) (Entered: 08/18/2022)
2022-08-1810Summons Issued as to defendants United States Department Of Homeland Security Office of Inspector General and United States Department of Homeland Security. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (JES) (Entered: 08/18/2022)
2022-09-2311SUMMONS Returned Executed upon US Dept of Homeland Security and US Dept of Homeland Security Office of Inspector General defendant All Plaintiffs. (Seu, Jane) (Entered: 09/23/2022)
2022-09-2812UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Timothy R. Hook on behalf of Defendants United States Department Of Homeland Security Office of Inspector General, United States Department of Homeland Security.(Hook, Timothy) (Entered: 09/28/2022)
2022-09-2913TEXT ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by October 31, 2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH) (Entered: 09/29/2022)
2022-10-2714UNOPPOSED MOTION to Stay Defendants' Responsive Pleading Deadline by Attorney Timothy R. Hook on behalf of Defendants United States Department Of Homeland Security Office of Inspector General, United States Department of Homeland Security.(Hook, Timothy) (Entered: 10/27/2022)
2022-10-2815TEXT ORDER granting 14 Unopposed Motion to Stay Deadline. Defendants' deadline to file a responsive pleading is stayed. The parties shall submit a report to bazis@ned.uscourts.gov advising as to the status of this case by December 1, 2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH) (Entered: 10/28/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar