Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS UNITED v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv02443
Date Filed2022-08-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffCITIZENS UNITED
Case DescriptionCitizens United submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Interior for records concerning communications between the agency's White House Liaison and the White House pertaining to the Hatch Act. Citizens United submitted the same request to three offices, the Assistant Secretary for Indian Affairs, the Bureau of Indian Affairs, and the Office of the Solicitor. The agency acknowledged receipt of all four requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Citizens United filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Vaughn index, Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-08-171COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9448845) filed by CITIZENS UNITED. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Summons to the Attorney General, # 4 Summons to the U.S. Attorney, # 5 Summons to the DOI)(Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 08/17/2022)
2022-08-172LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS UNITED (Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 08/17/2022)
2022-08-18Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (znmg) (Entered: 08/18/2022)
2022-08-183SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 08/18/2022)
2022-10-134NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie R. Johnson on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 10/13/2022)
2022-10-145Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 10/14/2022)
2022-10-17MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 5 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by November 18, 2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/17/2022. (lccrc1) (Entered: 10/17/2022)
2022-11-186ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/18/2022)
2022-11-21MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by December 5, 2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/21/2022. (lccrc1) (Entered: 11/21/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar