Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN IMMIGRANT INVESTOR ALLIANCE v. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv02598
Date Filed2022-08-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffAMERICAN IMMIGRANT INVESTOR ALLIANCE
Case DescriptionThe American Immigrant Investor Alliance submitted two FOIA requests to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning its program on U.S. investment by foreign investors. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, AIIA filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-08-291COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9476807) filed by AMERICAN IMMIGRANT INVESTOR ALLIANCE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Summons to USCIS, # 3 Summons Summons to Graves, # 4 Summons Summons to Garland)(Galati, Matthew) (Entered: 08/29/2022)
2022-08-30Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zsb) (Entered: 08/30/2022)
2022-08-302STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/30/2022. (lctnm3) (Entered: 08/30/2022)
2022-08-313SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmrl) (Entered: 08/31/2022)
2022-09-234RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/14/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/14/2022.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General served on 9/20/2022, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 9/19/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Service Exhibits)(Galati, Matthew) Modified serve/due date on 9/23/2022 (zed). (Entered: 09/23/2022)
2022-10-145NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas C. Dreier on behalf of UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 10/14/2022)
2022-10-146ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES.(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 10/14/2022)
2022-10-17MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court are a Complaint and an Answer in this FOIA case. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule should address, among other things, the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, and a briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if required. The parties shall file the schedule on or before December 16, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/17/2022. (lctnm3) (Entered: 10/17/2022)
2022-10-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/16/2022. (hmc) (Entered: 10/17/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar