Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY v. UNITED STATES CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv02789
Date Filed2022-09-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffCENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY
Case DescriptionThe Center for Food Safety submitted a FOIA request to the Centers for Disease Control for records concerning antifungal resistance as a result of use of fungicides registered under the Federal Insecticide, Fungicide and Rodenticide Act. CFS also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency asked CFS to narrow the scope of its request, which it did. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, CFS filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver

DefendantUNITED STATES CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-09-141COMPLAINT against CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9518770) filed by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons)(Stevenson, Meredith) (Entered: 09/14/2022)
2022-09-142LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY (Stevenson, Meredith) (Entered: 09/14/2022)
2022-09-16Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zsb) (Entered: 09/16/2022)
2022-09-163SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 09/16/2022)
2022-09-274RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/23/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/23/2022.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION served on 9/20/2022, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/23/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Stevenson, Meredith) (Entered: 09/27/2022)
2022-10-205Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by UNITED STATES CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 10/20/2022)
2022-10-21MINUTE ORDER granting Motion 5 for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond ; Set/Reset Deadlines: It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED, and defendant shall file its answer or otherwise respond by 11/23/2022. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/21/2022. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 10/21/2022)
2022-11-156MOTION to Dismiss by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Meredith) (Entered: 11/15/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar