Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv02844
Date Filed2022-09-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning travel costs and calendar entries for John Kerry in his role as special advisor on climate change. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-09-191COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9531506) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons US Department of State, # 3 Summons US Atty for DC, # 4 Summons US Atty General)(Aldrich, Jason) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/20/2022) (znmg). (Entered: 09/19/2022)
2022-09-192LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 09/19/2022)
2022-09-193ERRATA by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Summons US Attorney General)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 09/19/2022)
2022-09-20Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (znmg) (Entered: 09/20/2022)
2022-09-204SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 09/20/2022)
2022-09-215ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 09/21/2022. (DM) (Entered: 09/21/2022)
2022-11-286RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/18/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/18/2022.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/25/2022., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 11/23/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Cristina Rotaru)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 11/28/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar