Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv02849
Date Filed2022-09-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffPROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST
Case DescriptionProtect the Public's Trust submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Labor for records concerning communications between political appointees at the agency and a list of organizations and universities. PPT also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, PPT filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-09-191COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9532008) filed by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - FOIA 2022-F-06774, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney's Office, # 4 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney General, # 5 Summons Summons - Labor Solicitor)(Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 09/19/2022)
2022-09-20Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zsb) (Entered: 09/20/2022)
2022-09-202SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 09/20/2022)
2022-10-203NOTICE of Appearance by Sian Jones on behalf of All Defendants (Jones, Sian) (Entered: 10/20/2022)
2022-10-204MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, summary judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Declaration, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Sian) (Entered: 10/20/2022)
2022-11-035RESPONSE re 4 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, summary judgment filed by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Prior FOIA Response, # 2 Statement of Facts Response to Defendant's Statement of Allegedly Undisputed Material Facts, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 11/03/2022)
2022-11-076Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Sian) (Entered: 11/07/2022)
2022-11-07MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED, for good cause shown, that Defendant's 6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. Defendant shall file its reply in support of its 4 Motion to Dismiss by November 17, 2022. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/7/2022. (lctjk2) (Entered: 11/07/2022)
2022-11-177REPLY to opposition to motion re 4 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, summary judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Jones, Sian) (Entered: 11/17/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar